Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3107154

EP3107154 - LATCHING ARRANGEMENT FOR ELECTRICAL CONNECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.06.2019  [2019/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[N/P]
Former [2017/07]For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn PA 19312 / US
Former [2016/51]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Yi, Chong Hun
1024 Tiverton Road
Mechanicsburg, PA Pennsylvania 17050 / US
02 / McIntire, Steven Jon
880 Dry Run Road
Grantville, PA Pennsylvania 17028 / US
 [2016/51]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2016/51]
Application number, filing date16173935.410.06.2016
[2016/51]
Priority number, dateUS20151473966115.06.2015         Original published format: US201514739661
[2016/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3107154
Date:21.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/627, H01R24/28, H01R13/639, H01R107/00, H01R13/629
[2016/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/30]
Former [2016/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR ELEKTRISCHE VERBINDER[2016/51]
English:LATCHING ARRANGEMENT FOR ELECTRICAL CONNECTORS[2016/51]
French:SYSTÈME DE VERROUILLAGE POUR CONNECTEURS ÉLECTRIQUES[2016/51]
Examination procedure10.06.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/30]
03.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/23]
29.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/23]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201803   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0805523  (MOLEX INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1-5 *
 [Y]FR2631749  (ALSTHOM CGEE [FR]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *
 [A]US2006014417  (CROFOOT LARRY M [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1,4 *