Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3261357

EP3261357 - METHOD FOR A WIRELESS DATA COMMUNICATION BETWEEN A SENSOR SYSTEM AND A RECEIVER, A SYSTEM FOR A WIRELESS DATA COMMUNICATION, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.10.2018
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.04.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): EE, RO, SM
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For:DE 
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH
Sandhofer Straße 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[2017/52]
Inventor(s)01 / MUEGLITZ, Carsten
Leutersbergstrasse 92
69250 Schoenau / DE
02 / BOOTZ, Felix
Gruener Winkel 15
67346 Speyer / DE
 [2017/52]
Representative(s)Bittner, Thomas L.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[2017/52]
Application number, filing date16175960.023.06.2016
[2017/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3261357
Date:27.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3261357
Date:21.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04Q9/00, A61B5/00, G06F19/00
[2017/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/22]
Former [2017/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR EINE DRAHTLOSDATENKOMMUNIKATION ZWISCHEN EINEM SENSORSYSTEM UND EMPFÄNGER, SYSTEM ZUR DRAHTLOSEN DATENKOMMUNIKATION UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT[2017/52]
English:METHOD FOR A WIRELESS DATA COMMUNICATION BETWEEN A SENSOR SYSTEM AND A RECEIVER, A SYSTEM FOR A WIRELESS DATA COMMUNICATION, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT[2017/52]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNÉES SANS FIL ENTRE UN SYSTÈME DE CAPTEUR ET UN RÉCEPTEUR, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNÉES SANS FIL ET PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE[2017/52]
Examination procedure23.06.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.04.2018Examination requested  [2018/22]
04.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2018Fee for grant paid
01.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
[2019/37]
Former [2019/26]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT21.11.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US2015164391  (HERNANDEZ-ROSAS JOSE HECTOR [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 1,4 * * page 12, paragraph 153 * * page 12, paragraph 157 - page 14, paragraph 163 *
by applicantWO2015094981
 US2009118592
 EP2011283
 US8622903
 WO2015069797
 EP2973082