Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3091673

EP3091673 - SATELLITE TRANSPONDER WITH A SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR PROCESSING COMMUNICATION DATA BY ANALOG DIGITAL CONVERSION OF THE SIGNALS, FORMATION OF FREQUENCY CHANNELS AND COMBINATION OF THEM BY A SWITCH WITH A PLURALITY OF STAGES. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[2016/45]
Inventor(s)01 / HOFFMEYER, Mark A.
1950 E Imperial Hwy
M/C: W-S12-W378
El Segundo, CA 90245-2701 / US
02 / MILLER, Kristina
900 North Sepulveda Blvd
M/C: W-S30-A400
El Segundo, CA 90245-2710 / US
03 / BALTER, Irwin
900 North Sepulveda Blvd
M/C: W-S30-A400
El Segundo, CA 90245-2710 / US
04 / ROH, Tae J
900 North Sepulveda Blvd
M/C: W-S30-A400
El Segundo, CA 90245-2710 / US
 [2016/45]
Representative(s)Howson, Richard Giles Bentham , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/07]Thorniley, Peter
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
Former [2016/45]Thorniley, Peter
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date16176223.231.10.2013
[2016/45]
Priority number, dateUS20121366644901.11.2012         Original published format: US201213666449
[2016/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3091673
Date:09.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3091673
Date:16.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3091673
Date:14.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/185
[2016/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/45]
TitleGerman:SATELLITEN TRANSPONDER MIT ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON KOMMUNIKATIONSDATEN DURCH DIGITALISIERUNG DER SIGNALEN, BILDUNG VON FREQUENZKANÄLEN UND ZUSAMMENFÜGUNG DEREN MITTELS EINES MEHRSTUFIGEN SCHALTERS[2016/45]
English:SATELLITE TRANSPONDER WITH A SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR PROCESSING COMMUNICATION DATA BY ANALOG DIGITAL CONVERSION OF THE SIGNALS, FORMATION OF FREQUENCY CHANNELS AND COMBINATION OF THEM BY A SWITCH WITH A PLURALITY OF STAGES.[2016/45]
French:TRANSPONDEUR DE SATELLITE AVEC UN SYSTÈME ET UNE MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES DE COMMUNICATION PAR CONVERSION ANALOGIQUE DIGITALE, FORMATION DE CANAUX FRÉQUENTIELS ET LEUR COMBINAISON PAR UN COMMUTATEUR À PLUSIEURS ÉTAGES[2016/45]
Examination procedure24.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/45]
16.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2017Fee for grant paid
21.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13191118.2  / EP2728770
Divisional application(s)EP17200881.5  / EP3297181
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.11.2018   
Airbus Defence and Space Limited/ Airbus Defence and Space SAS
Gunnels Wood Road/
51-61 route de Verneuil
Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2AS/
78130 Les Mureaux / GB
Opponent's representative
Cork, Robert
Venner Shipley LLP
5 Stirling House
Stirling Road The Surrey Research Park
Guildford GU2 7RF / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2018/51]
Opponent(s)01  14.11.2018   
Airbus Defence and Space Limited/ Airbus Defence and Space SAS
Gunnels Wood Road/
51-61 route de Verneuil
Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2AS/
78130 Les Mureaux / GB
Opponent's representative
Cork, Robert
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
30.11.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.04.2019Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
MC14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SI14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
BE31.10.2018
CH31.10.2018
IE31.10.2018
LI31.10.2018
LU31.10.2018
MT31.10.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/48]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
MC14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SI14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
BE31.10.2018
CH31.10.2018
IE31.10.2018
LI31.10.2018
LU31.10.2018
Former [2019/40]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
MC14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SI14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
BE31.10.2018
CH31.10.2018
LI31.10.2018
LU31.10.2018
Former [2019/38]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
MC14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SI14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
BE31.10.2018
LU31.10.2018
Former [2019/30]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
MC14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SI14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
LU31.10.2018
Former [2019/28]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
MC14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SI14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2019/13]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SI14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2004073229  (BOEING CO [US]; BELL DOUGLAS T [US]; CLEBOWICZ BRIAN A [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 11] , [0 30] - [0038] - [0 41] - [0048] - [0 50] - [0052] - [0 63]; figures 2, 3, 5, 6 *;
 [Y]US2005275504  (TORZA ANTHONY [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0004]; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]EP2184866  (COM DEV INT LTD [CA]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP1139584  (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-11 *
OppositionWO2004073229
 US2005275504  * ; *
 EP2184866  * ; *
 EP1139584  * ; *
 WO2009144096  * ; *
 US4931802  * ; *
    - CHARLES CLOS, "A study of Non-blocking Switching Networks", The Bell System Technical Journal, (19521030), pages 406 - 424, XP011630698

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/j.1538-7305.1953.tb01433.x
    - MISHA SCHWARTZ, "Introduction to Circuit Switching", MISHA SCHWARTZ, Telecommunication Networks: Protocols, Modeling and Analysis, (19881100), pages 526 - 533, XP055529325
    - CELINE HAARDT et al., "Internet Switching by Satellite: An Ultra-fast processor with Radio Burst Switching", Alcatel Space, (20050524), pages 1 - 18, XP055378728
    - DAVID CALCUTT et al., "Chapter 9", Satellite Communications: Principles and Applications, (19940801), pages 179 - 202, XP055529333
    - Alvar Saenz-Otero, Design Principles for the Development of Space Technology Maturation Laboratories Aboard the International Space Station, (20050600), pages 1 - 428