Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3104194

EP3104194 - ROBOT POSITIONING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.12.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.11.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
13.12.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aktiebolaget Electrolux
S:t Göransgatan 143
105 45 Stockholm / SE
[2016/50]
Inventor(s)01 / HAEGERMARCK, Anders
Edbovägen 12
142 63 Trångsund / SE
 [2016/50]
Representative(s)Electrolux Group Patents
AB Electrolux
Group Patents
105 45 Stockholm / SE
[2016/50]
Application number, filing date16176479.023.08.2013
[2016/50]
Priority number, dateSE2012000051427.08.2012         Original published format: SE 1200514
[2016/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3104194
Date:14.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3104194
Date:06.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01S17/46, G01S17/02, G05D1/02
[2016/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/30]
Former [2016/50]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ROBOTERPOSITIONIERUNGSSYSTEM[2016/50]
English:ROBOT POSITIONING SYSTEM[2016/50]
French:SYSTÈME DE POSITIONNEMENT DE ROBOT[2016/50]
Examination procedure27.06.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/30]
27.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2018Fee for grant paid
18.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13756056.1  / EP2888603
Opposition(s)07.11.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL06.02.2019
AT06.02.2019
CZ06.02.2019
DK06.02.2019
EE06.02.2019
ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
PL06.02.2019
RO06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
SK06.02.2019
SM06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
[2020/03]
Former [2019/52]AL06.02.2019
CZ06.02.2019
DK06.02.2019
EE06.02.2019
ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
PL06.02.2019
RO06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
SK06.02.2019
SM06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/51]AL06.02.2019
CZ06.02.2019
DK06.02.2019
EE06.02.2019
ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RO06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
SK06.02.2019
SM06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/49]AL06.02.2019
CZ06.02.2019
DK06.02.2019
EE06.02.2019
ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RO06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
SK06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/48]DK06.02.2019
ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/47]ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US5349378  (MAALI FEREYDOUN [US]) [X] 1,2,5,9,10,12 * column 3, line 30 - column 8, line 2; figures 1-3 * [A] 8,13,15 [I] 3,4,6,7,11;
 [I]US2005088643  (ANDERSON NOEL W [US]) [I] 1,5,9-12,14,15 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0042]; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2007267570  (PARK DONG-RYEOL [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0053]; figures 2A,4A *;
 [A]US2006235585  (TANAKA HIROTO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0043]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]GB2382251  (SAMSUNG KWANGJU ELECTRONICS CO [KR]) [A] 1-15 * page 11, line 14 - page 13, line 4; figures 7-9 *
by applicantUS2002091466