Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3263080

EP3263080 - TRANSPORT METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TAMPONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.07.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ontex BVBA
Genthof 5
9255 Buggenhout / BE
[2019/25]
Former [2018/01]For all designated states
Ontex BVBA
Genthof 5
9255 Buggenhout / BE
Inventor(s)01 / HEEGE, Rudolf
Pommersbachstraße 79
56759 Kaisersesch / DE
02 / HEEGE, Thomas
Robert-Bosch-Strasse 8
56727 Mayen / DE
 [2018/01]
Representative(s)Larangé, Françoise , et al
Ontex BVBA
Korte Keppestraat 21
9320 Aalst / BE
[2019/25]
Former [2018/01]Brantsandpatents bvba
Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24
9051 Ghent / BE
Application number, filing date16176747.028.06.2016
[2018/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3263080
Date:03.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3263080
Date:19.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/20, B65G49/00, B28B3/00
[2018/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/32]
Former [2018/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:TRANSPORTVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR TAMPONS[2018/01]
English:TRANSPORT METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TAMPONS[2018/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSPORT POUR TAMPONS[2018/01]
Examination procedure28.06.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/32]
22.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.2019Fee for grant paid
07.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/50]AL19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
Cited inInternational search[X]DE19902643  (RUGGLI PROJECTS AG [CH]) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 65 - column 5, line 25; figure - *
 [X]EP1304095  (RUGGLI PROJECTS AG [CH]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0026]; figure - *
 [AD]US3874032  (SIMON STEFAN ET AL) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [AD]US3845520  (SIMON S) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *
 US3874032  [ ]
 US3845520  [ ]