Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3094129

EP3094129 - REFERENCE SIGNAL CONFIGURATION FOR COORDINATED MULTIPOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2016/46]
Inventor(s)01 / DAVYDOV, Alexei
Lenin Av. 28/11-40
603132 Nizhny Novgorod / RU
02 / MOROZOV, Gregory
Geroya Davydova Str. 2-9
603000 Nizhny Novgorod / RU
03 / BOLOTIN, Ilya
Korablestroiteley St. 26/1-8
603158 Nizhny Novgorod / RU
04 / ETEMAD, Kamran
10629 Beechknoll Ln
Potomac, MD Maryland 20854 / US
 [2016/46]
Representative(s)Withers & Rogers
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/46]Goddar, Heinz J.
BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date16177108.405.06.2013
[2016/46]
Priority number, dateUS201261679627P03.08.2012         Original published format: US 201261679627 P
US20131379672012.03.2013         Original published format: US201313796720
[2016/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3094129
Date:16.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/10
[2016/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/26]
Former [2016/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:REFERENZSIGNALKONFIGURATION FÜR COMP[2016/46]
English:REFERENCE SIGNAL CONFIGURATION FOR COORDINATED MULTIPOINT[2016/46]
French:CONFIGURATION DE SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE POUR UN SYSTÈME MULTIPOINT COORDONNÉ[2016/46]
Examination procedure30.06.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/26]
07.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13826117.7  / EP2880778
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]  - ERICSSON ET AL, "Control Signaling in Support of CoMP", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-122843, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120512), vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20120521 - 20120530, XP050601017 [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 2, paragraph 6 *
 [A]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "Consideration on Interference Measurement Resource", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-122295_IMR FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120512), vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20120521 - 20120525, XP050600558 [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 2.1 *
 [A]  - FUJITSU, "Email discussion [69-10]: Details of collision handling and compression/multiplexing in case of 2 or more CSIs being configured in the same reporting instance for CoMP CSI feedback", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20120521 - 20120525, (20120719), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-122930 EMAIL DISCUSSION 69-10 COLLISION HANDLING - SUMMARY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_69/Docs/, (20120719), XP050660966 [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph 2 *
 [A]  - INTEL CORPORATION, "Downlink control signaling for DL CoMP", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-122629 DOWNLINK CONTROL SIGNALING FOR DL COMP, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120512), vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech; 20120521 - 20120525, XP050600814 [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 2 *
 [AD]  - "LTE; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Physical channels and modulation (3GPP TS 36.211 version 10.5.0 Release 10)", TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20120701), vol. 3GPP RAN 1, no. V10.5.0, XP014070521 [AD] 1-15 * page 86, paragraph 6.10.5 - page 90 *