Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3267520

EP3267520 - MULTIPURPOSE BATTERY AND MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR A MULTIPURPOSE BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.07.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2018/02]
Inventor(s)01 / MEMISOGLU, Görkem
c/o Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bolgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
02 / ÖCAL, Ömür
c/o Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bolgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
03 / ABBAK, Mehmet
c/o Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bolgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2018/02]
Representative(s)Ascherl, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2018/02]
Application number, filing date16177927.705.07.2016
[2018/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3267520
Date:10.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01M6/42, H01M10/04, H01M10/0585, H01M10/052
[2018/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/33]
Former [2018/02]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MULTIFUNKTIONSBATTERIE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2018/02]
English:MULTIPURPOSE BATTERY AND MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR A MULTIPURPOSE BATTERY[2018/02]
French:BATTERIE POLYVALENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2018/02]
Examination procedure05.07.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/33]
08.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational searchUS2001007725  [ ]
 [XYI]EP1441409  (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-12 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0006] , [0008]; figure 1 * [Y] 3 [I] 13,14
 [X]WO2005077085  (ENERDEL INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,11,12 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0006] , [0008]; figure 3A *
 [Y]US2015188207  (SON YONGKYU [US] ET AL) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0046]; figure 3 *