Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3235391

EP3235391 - ANTI-SEEPAGE ATOMIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.10.2018  [2018/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shenzhen Jieshibo Technology Co. Ltd.
4/f Building 3
Xianyuxing Industrial Park
Fuhe Road
Gonghe Community, Shajing Street, Bao'an
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / WU, Jianyong
Shenzhen Jieshibo Technology Co., Ltd
Building 3, Xianyuxing Industrial Park, Fuhe Road
Gonghe Community, Shajing Street, Baoan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)Sun, Yiming
HUASUN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Friedrichstraße 33
80801 München / DE
[2017/43]
Application number, filing date16178897.111.07.2016
[2017/43]
Priority number, dateCN20161024861720.04.2016         Original published format: CN201610248617
[2017/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3235391
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:A24F47/00
[2017/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANTI-SICKER-ZERSTÄUBER[2017/43]
English:ANTI-SEEPAGE ATOMIZER[2017/43]
French:ATOMISEUR ANTI-SUINTEMENT[2017/43]
Examination procedure26.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/44]
12.06.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/44]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201803   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2014332021  (LI YONGHAI [CN], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012]; figure 6; claims 1-11 * [I] 5,6,8-10;
 [A]US2015164142  (LI YONGHAI [CN], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]CN204232300U  (HUIZHOU KIMREE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2015149311  (KIMREE HI TECH INC) [A] 1-10 * abstract *