Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3270262

EP3270262 - TOUCH-SCREEN CONTROL DEVICE WITH HAPTIC FEEDBACK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2018/03]
Inventor(s)01 / KIRISKEN, Barbaros
c/o VESTEL ELEKTRONIK SANAYI VE TICARET A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2018/03]
Representative(s)Ascherl, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2018/03]
Application number, filing date16179061.312.07.2016
[2018/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3270262
Date:17.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/01, G06F3/0484, G06F3/0488
[2018/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/34]
Former [2018/03]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRMSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT HAPTISCHEM FEEDBACK[2018/03]
English:TOUCH-SCREEN CONTROL DEVICE WITH HAPTIC FEEDBACK[2018/03]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE À ÉCRAN TACTILE À RETOUR HAPTIQUE[2018/03]
Examination procedure12.07.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[I]EP2733576  (IMMERSION CORP [US]) [I] 1-15 * figures 1A, 3A-6 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0 22] * * paragraphs [0025] , [0 28] , [0 29] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0039] * * paragraphs [0045] - [0057] * * paragraphs [0068] - [0075] * * paragraphs [0081] - [0090] *;
 [I]EP2889727  (IMMERSION CORP [US]) [I] 1-15 * figures 1, 3, 11, 12 * * paragraphs [0015] - [0018] - [0 23] * * paragraphs [0030] , [0036] * * paragraphs [0046] - [0049] * * paragraphs [0051] - [0055] *;
 [AD]US2014267135  (CHHABRA KAPIL [US]) [AD] 1,5 * paragraphs [0013] , [0 48] *;
 [A]US2012013552  (AHN WON ICK [KR]) [A] 14,15 * paragraphs [0050] - [0052] * * paragraphs [0078] - [0085]; figure 6 *
by applicantWO2014201151
 US2013278552
 US2014267135