Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3269444

EP3269444 - METHOD OF IDENTIFYING DROPLETS IN A STACK AND AN ASSOCIATED SEQUENCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.01.2019  [2019/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Base4 Innovation Ltd
Broers Building
J J Thomson Avenue
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB3 0FA / GB
[2018/03]
Inventor(s)01 / FRAYLING, Cameron Alexander
Base4 Innovation Limited
Broers Building
JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB3 0FA / GB
02 / ISAAC, Thomas Henry
Base4 Innovation Limited
Broers Building
JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB3 0FA / GB
 [2018/03]
Representative(s)Briscoe, Paul Brian , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2018/03]
Application number, filing date16179518.214.07.2016
[2018/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3269444
Date:17.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.2017
ClassificationInternational:B01J19/00, B01L3/02, G01N35/10, C12Q1/68
[2018/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON TRÖPFCHEN IN EINEM STAPEL UND ZUGEHÖRIGER SEQUENZIERER[2018/03]
English:METHOD OF IDENTIFYING DROPLETS IN A STACK AND AN ASSOCIATED SEQUENCER[2018/03]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION DE GOUTTELETTES DANS UN EMPILEMENT ET SÉQUENCEUR ASSOCIÉ[2018/03]
Examination procedure18.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/04]
04.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2019/04]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201803   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US2003087309  (CHEN SHIPING [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1, 20; [0122]; [0194] *;
 [A]WO2014151658  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures *;
 [A]US2002001546  (HUNTER IAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures; [0060] *;
 [A]US2014272996  (BEMIS ADAM [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 12 *;
 [A]US2011053798  (HINDSON BENJAMIN J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US2013225418  (WATSON ANDREW [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 6 *;
 [A]  - BENJAMIN J. HINDSON ET AL, "High-Throughput Droplet Digital PCR System for Absolute Quantitation of DNA Copy Number", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (20111115), vol. 83, no. 22, doi:10.1021/ac202028g, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 8604 - 8610, XP055047554 [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac202028g
 [A]  - BO CHANG ET AL, "Self-alignment in the stacking of microchips with mist-induced water droplets;Self-alignment in stacking of microchips with water mist induced droplets", JOURNAL OF MICROMECHANICS & MICROENGINEERING, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (20101221), vol. 21, no. 1, doi:10.1088/0960-1317/21/1/015016, ISSN 0960-1317, page 15016, XP020202804 [A] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0960-1317/21/1/015016
by applicantWO2014053854
 WO2014167323
 WO2014005385
 WO2016012789
 US2016122802
 WO2014053853
 EP20150002007