Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3138702

EP3138702 - TWO-WAY COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR TRACKING LOCATIONS AND STATUSES OF WHEELED VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.06.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.03.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Change - prioritypublished on 20.11.2019  [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gatekeeper Systems, Inc.
90 Icon
Foothill Ranch, CA 92610 / US
[2018/28]
Former [2017/10]For all designated states
Gatekeeper Systems, Inc.
9331 Irvine Boulevard
Irvine CA 92618 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HANNAH, Stephen, E.
1806 Geeting Pl.
Placentia, CA California 92870 / US
02 / CARTER, Scott, J.
4297 Dogwood Avenue
Seal Beach, CA California 90740 / US
03 / JAMES, Jesse, M.
18 Chantilly Lane
Ladera Ranch, CA California 92694 / US
 [2017/10]
Representative(s)Fennell, Gareth Charles , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2019/46]
Former [2017/10]Fennell, Gareth Charles , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date16179519.020.03.2006
[2017/10]
Priority number, dateUS200566319505P18.03.2005         Original published format: US 66319505 P
US200566314705P18.03.2005         Original published format: US 66314705 P
US200566332705P18.03.2005         Original published format: US 66332705 P
[2019/47]
Former [2017/10]US20050663195P18.03.2005
US20050663147P18.03.2005
US20050663327P18.03.2005
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3138702
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3138702
Date:13.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60C23/00, H02K7/18, B62B5/04, B62B3/14, G08B13/24, G06Q10/08, B60T7/16, G08G1/00, // H02K7/102
[2017/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/15]
Former [2017/10]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ZWEIWEGE-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM ZUR VERFOLGUNG VON STANDORT UND STATUS EINES RADFAHRZEUGES[2017/10]
English:TWO-WAY COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR TRACKING LOCATIONS AND STATUSES OF WHEELED VEHICLES[2017/10]
French:SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION BIDIRECTIONNEL PERMETTANT DE SUIVRE LES POSITIONS ET LES ÉTATS DE VÉHICULES À ROUES[2017/10]
Examination procedure14.07.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/15]
21.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2019Fee for grant paid
30.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06748454.3  / EP1864082
Divisional application(s)EP19202571.6
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
14.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
14.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
14.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
14.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO9834819  (LACE EFFECT LLC [US], et al) [AD] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]US6102414  (SCHWENINGER DAVID [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5283550  (MACINTYRE DANIEL C [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5357182  (WOLFE STEVEN M [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003102969  (PARSONS NATAN E [US]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US5315290  (MORENO RAUL G [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *
by applicantUS6362728