Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3270127

EP3270127 - MINIATURIZED WAVEGUIDE IMAGING SPECTROMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.01.2019  [2019/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Micos Engineering GmbH
Überlandstrasse 129
8600 Dübendorf / CH
For all designated states
Eidgenössische Materialprüfungs- und Forschungsanstalt EMPA
Überlandstrasse 129
8600 Dübendorf / CH
[2018/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Madi, Mohammadreza
Risistrasse 32b
8903 Birmenstorf / CH
02 / Alberti, Edoardo
Bodenacherstrasse 101
8121 Benglen / CH
03 / Shorubalko, Ivan
Überlandstrasse 129
8600 Dübendorf / CH
 [2018/03]
Representative(s)Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte
Beethovenstrasse 49
Postfach
8027 Zürich / CH
[2018/03]
Application number, filing date16179718.815.07.2016
[2018/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3270127
Date:17.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01J3/02, G01J3/453
[2018/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MINIATURISIERTES WELLENLEITERBILDGEBUNGSSPEKTROMETER[2018/03]
English:MINIATURIZED WAVEGUIDE IMAGING SPECTROMETER[2018/03]
French:SPECTROMÈTRE IMAGEUR DE GUIDE D'ONDE MINIATURISÉ[2018/03]
Examination procedure18.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/03]
31.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2019/03]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201803   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2016025727  (VORBECK MATERIALS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0016] , [0057] , [0071] , [0081] , [0085] , [0092] , [0093] *
 [IY]  - GULDIMANN BENEDIKT ET AL, "Focal plane array spectrometer: miniaturization effort for space optical instruments", MOEMS AND MINIATURIZED SYSTEMS X, SPIE, 1000 20TH ST. BELLINGHAM WA 98225-6705 USA, (20110210), vol. 7930, no. 1, doi:10.1117/12.882501, pages 1 - 14, XP060006410 [I] 1-3,5-15 * page 6, paragraph l - page 7, paragraph 1 * * figure 4 * [Y] 1-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.882501
 [A]  - ETIENNE LE COARER ET AL, "Wavelength-scale stationary-wave integrated Fourier-transform spectrometry", NATURE PHOTONICS, (20070801), vol. 1, no. 8, doi:10.1038/nphoton.2007.138, ISSN 1749-4885, pages 473 - 478, XP055181717 [A] 1,12 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nphoton.2007.138
by applicantEP1825312
    - P. KERN, "On-chip spectro-detection for fully integrated coherent beam combiners.", OPT.EXPRESS, (2009), vol. 17, pages 1976 - 1987
    - L. KEESEY, NASA'S GODDARD SPACE FLIGHT CENTER, (2012), URL: http://www.nasa.gov/topics/technology/features/chip-spectrometer.html
    - E. LE COARER, "Wavelength-scale stationary-wave integrated Fourier-transform spectrometry.", NATURE PHOTONICS, (2007), vol. 1.8, pages 473 - 478
    - G. B.; K. S., "Focal Plane Array Spectrometer: miniaturization effort for space optical instruments.", PROC. OF SPIE, (2010), vol. 7930, pages 01 - 14