Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3270127 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3270127



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 53
11.12.2018 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
04.09.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
31.08.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
22.01.2018 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
20.12.2017 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
24.01.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.01.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 4
24.01.2017 European search report Search / examination 2
24.01.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
09.01.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
08.11.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
15.07.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.07.2016 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
15.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
15.07.2016 Description Search / examination 16
15.07.2016 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.07.2016 Drawings Search / examination 3
15.07.2016 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5