Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3270127


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.12.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
05.09.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
30.08.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
15.12.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.01.2018  [2018/03]
20.07.2016 Change - representative