Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3270127 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201780056865 EP16179718 EP17734366



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019219445Global Dossier 18.07.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP16179718 15.07.2016
WO2017EP66784 05.07.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3485243Global Dossier 22.05.2019A1
Priority number Date
EP16179718 15.07.2016
WO2017EP66784 05.07.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN110023727Global Dossier 16.07.2019A
Priority number Date
EP16179718 15.07.2016
WO2017EP66784 05.07.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2018011035Global Dossier 18.01.2018A1
Priority number Date
EP16179718 15.07.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3270127Global Dossier 17.01.2018A1
Priority number Date
EP16179718 15.07.2016