Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3138396

EP3138396 - ANIMAL MODEL EXPRESSING LUCIFERASE UNDER CONTROL OF THE MYELIN BASIC PROTEIN PROMOTER (MBP-LUCI) AND USE OF THE MODEL FOR BIOLUMINESCENCE IN VIVO IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.03.2018  [2018/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANOFI
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[2017/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Cao, James
c/o Sanofi-aventis U.S. 1041 Route 202-206
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
02 / Chandross, Karen
c/o Sanofi-aventis U.S. 1041 Route 202-206
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
03 / Economides, Kyriakos D.
c/o Sanofi-aventis U.S. 1041 Route 202-206
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
04 / Polites, Harry Gregory
c/o Sanofi-aventis U.S. 1041 Route 202-206
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
05 / Weinstock, Daniel
14 Woodside Lane
Flemington, NJ 08822 / US
06 / Ying, Xiaoyou
c/o Sanofi
55 Corporate Drive
Mail Code: 55A-505A
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
 [2017/33]
Former [2017/10]01 / Cao, James
c/o Sanofi-aventis U.S. 1041 Route 202-206
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
02 / Chandross, Karen
c/o Sanofi-aventis U.S. 1041 Route 202-206
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
03 / Economides, Kyriakos D.
c/o Sanofi-aventis U.S. 1041 Route 202-206
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
04 / Polites, Harry Gregory
c/o Sanofi-aventis U.S. 1041 Route 202-206
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
05 / Weinstock, Daniel
c/o Sanofi
55 Corporate Drive
Mail Code: 55A-505A
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
06 / Ying, Xiaoyou
c/o Sanofi
55 Corporate Drive
Mail Code: 55A-505A
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
Representative(s)Böhmer, Thomas
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/10]Böhmer, Thomas
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
Application number, filing date16181234.203.12.2010
[2017/10]
Priority number, dateUS20090287371P17.12.2009         Original published format: US 287371 P
US20100334637P14.05.2010         Original published format: US 334637 P
FR2010005758121.09.2010         Original published format: FR 1057581
[2017/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3138396
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:A01K67/027, C12N15/85
[2017/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/10]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LUCIFERASE-EXPRIMIERENDES TIERMODEL UNTER KONTROLLE DES MBP-PROMOTERS UND VERWENDUNG DES MODELLS ZUR BIOLUMINESZENZ BEI IN-VIVO-BILDGEBUNG[2017/10]
English:ANIMAL MODEL EXPRESSING LUCIFERASE UNDER CONTROL OF THE MYELIN BASIC PROTEIN PROMOTER (MBP-LUCI) AND USE OF THE MODEL FOR BIOLUMINESCENCE IN VIVO IMAGING[2017/10]
French:MODÈLE ANIMAL EXPRIMANT LA LUCIFÉRASE SOUS LE CONTRÔLE DU PROMOTEUR DE LA PROTÉINE BASIQUE DE MYÉLINE (MBP-LUCI) ET UTILISATION DE CE MODÈLE POUR L'IMAGERIE IN VIVO DE BIOLUMINESCENCE[2017/10]
Examination procedure09.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/13]
30.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/13]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10788203.7  / EP2512227
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201708   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2008022045  (MYELIN REPAIR FOUNDATION INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [00103] * * paragraph [00110] *;
 [A]  - LUO J ET AL, "Bioluminescence in vivo imaging of autoimmune encephalomyelitis predicts disease", JOURNAL OF NEUROINFLAMMATION, (200802), vol. 5, pages 1 - 6, XP002624068 [A] 1-9 * abstract, reuslts and discussion; *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1742-2094-5-6
 [A]  - FARHADI H F ET AL, "A COMBINATORIAL NETWORK OF EVOLUTIONARILY CONSERVED MYELIN BASIC PROTEIN REGULATORY SEQUENCES CONFERS DISTINCT GLIAL-SPECIFIC PHENOTYPES", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20031112), vol. 23, no. 32, ISSN 0270-6474, pages 10214 - 10223, XP008037383 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [T]  - BADR C E ET AL, "Bioluminescence imaging: progress and applications", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 29, no. 12, doi:10.1016/J.TIBTECH.2011.06.010, ISSN 0167-7799, (2011), pages 624 - 633, (20110620), XP028112001 [T] 1-9 * page 631, column r, paragraph last - page 632, column l, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2011.06.010
 [T]  - CLOSE D M ET AL, "In Vivo Bioluminescent Imaging (BLI): Noninvasive Visualization and Interrogation of Biological Processes in Living Animals", SENSORS, (20110101), vol. 11, no. 1, doi:10.3390/s110100180, pages 180 - 206, XP055180978 [T] 1-9 * page 184, paragraph 2; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s110100180
 [T]  - HOCHGRÄFE K ET AL, "Making the Brain Glow: In Vivo Bioluminescence Imaging to Study Neurodegeneration", MOLECULAR NEUROBIOLOGY, (20130601), vol. 47, no. 3, doi:10.1007/s12035-012-8379-1, ISSN 0893-7648, pages 868 - 882, XP055180979 [T] 1-9 * abstract; page 869, left-hand column, first paragraph- page 870, right-hand column, first paragraph; page 878, right-hand column, last paragraph *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12035-012-8379-1
by applicantUS5650135
 US2007149580
    - DIMASI, JA ET AL., J HEALTH ECON, vol. 22, pages 151 - 185,
    - LINDSAY MA, NATURE REV DRUG DISCOVERY, vol. 2, pages 831 - 838,
    - RUDIN M ET AL., PROGRESS IN DRUG RES, (2005), vol. 62, pages 185 - 255,
    - MASSOUD T.F., GENES DEV., vol. 17, pages 545 - 580,
    - MAGGIE A; CIANA P., NAT. REV. DRUG DISCVY., vol. 4, pages 249 - 255,
    - MAGGIE A., TRENDS PHARMACOLO. SCI., vol. 25, page 337,
    - CONTAG, CH, MOL. MICROBIOL., vol. 18, pages 593 - 603,
    - GREER LFIII, LUMINESCENCE, vol. 17, pages 43 - 74,
    - CONTAG CH, MOL. MICROBIO., vol. 18, pages 593 - 603,
    - SPIBEY CP ET AL., ELECTROPHORESIS, vol. 22, pages 829 - 836,
    - CONTAG CH, ANNU.REV.BIOMED.ENG., vol. 4, pages 235 - 260,
    - GUPTA ET AL., BRAIN RES., vol. 464, pages 133 - 141,
    - LUDWIN SK, LAB INVEST, (1978), vol. 39, pages 597 - 612,
    - MERKLER ET AL., NMR BIOMED, (2005), vol. 18, pages 395 - 403,
    - MATSUSHIMA ET AL., BRAIN PATHOL, (2001), vol. 11, pages 107 - 116,
    - IRVINE KA ET AL., J NEUROIMMUNOL, (2006), vol. 175, pages 69 - 76,
    - FRANCO RJM, NAT REV, (2002), vol. 3, pages 705 - 714,
    - FARHADI ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (20031112), vol. 23, no. 32, pages 10214 - 10223,
    - HF FARHADI, J.NEUROSC., (2003), vol. 23, no. 32, pages 10214 - 10223,
    - MATSUSHIMA GK; MORELL P, BRAIN PATHOLOGY, (2001), vol. 11, pages 1 - 10,
    - JUREVICS H ET AL., JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 82, pages 126 - 136,
    - YANBO ZHANG, "Quetiapine alleviates the cuprizone-induced white matter pathology in brain of C57BL/6 mouse", SCHIZOPHRENIA RESEARCH, (20081210), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/j.schres.2008.09.013, pages 182 - 91, XP025677665

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.schres.2008.09.013
    - CONTAG, P. ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (1998), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 245 - 247,
    - CONTAG, C. ET AL., OSA TOPS ON BIOMEDICAL OPTICAL SPECTROSCOPY AND DIAGNOSTICS, (1996), vol. 3, pages 220 - 224,
    - CONTAG, C. H., PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 66, no. 4, pages 523 - 531,
    - CONTAG, C. H., MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 18, no. 4, pages 593 - 603,
    - FARHADI, JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE,
    - BAKKER; LUDWIN, J NEUROL SCI, (1987), vol. 78, pages 125 - 37,
    - HIREMATH ET AL., J NEUROIMMUNOL, (1998), vol. 92, pages 38 - 49,
    - MCMAHON ET AL., J NEUROIMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 130, pages 32 - 45,
    - MATSUSHIMA; MORELL, BRAIN PATHOL, (2001), vol. 11, pages 107 - 16,
    - PLUCHINO ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 436, pages 266 - 71,
    - Transgenic animal technology: A laboratory handbook, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC., (1994),
    - Strategies in transgenic animal science, ASM PRESS, (1995),
    - JUREVICS ET AL., JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 82, pages 126 - 136,
    - J. BERGER; D. E. MILLER, ANNU. REV. MED., (2002), vol. 53, pages 409 - 435,
    - J. GRANNEMAN ET AL., J. NEUROSCI. RES., (1998), vol. 51, pages 563 - 573,
    - I. SALUJA ET AL., GLIA, (2001), vol. 33, pages 194 - 204,
    - MOL CELL BIOLOGY, vol. 20, page 5119,
    - POLAK ET AL., J NEUROIMMUNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 168, pages 65 - 75,
    - M LINDNER; S HEINE ET AL., NEUROPATHOLOGY AND APPLIED NEUROBIOLOGY, (2008), vol. 34, pages 105 - 114,
    - SCHIZOPHRENIA RESEARCH, (200812), vol. 106, pages 182 - 91,
    - ZHANG ET AL., SCHIZOPHRENIA RESEARCH, (2008), vol. 106, pages 182 - 91,