Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3275608

EP3275608 - METHOD TO MANUFACTURE A RAZOR HANDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.09.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.07.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Gillette Company LLC
One Gillette Park
Boston, MA 02127 / US
[2019/08]
Former [2018/05]For all designated states
The Gillette Company LLC
One Gillette Park
Boston, MA 02127 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FRIEND, Alexander James Hinchliffe
460 Basingstoke Road
Reading Berkshire RG2 0QE / GB
 [2018/05]
Representative(s)P&G Patent Germany
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Straße 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/08]Töpert, Verena Clarita
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2018/05]Kohol, Sonia
N.V. Procter & Gamble
Services Company S.A.
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date16181947.929.07.2016
[2018/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3275608
Date:31.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3275608
Date:20.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:B26B21/52
[2018/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/35]
Former [2018/05]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES RASIERERGRIFFS[2018/05]
English:METHOD TO MANUFACTURE A RAZOR HANDLE[2018/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN MANCHE DE RASOIR[2018/05]
Examination procedure29.07.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/35]
18.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2019Fee for grant paid
02.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
PL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
[2019/52]
Former [2019/51]AL20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/49]AL20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/48]DK20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/47]ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
NO20.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
NO20.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2007072378  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 1, line 9 - page 3, line 8; figures 1-6, 9a, 9b *;
 [A]US2013291390  (GAJRIA CHANDRASEN [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0014]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2053258  (LEO AXIEN) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 2; figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]WO2015101566  (MOLINARI ANDREA [IT]) [A] 1-5 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 27; figures 1-4 *