EP3106176 - ALUMINIUM COMPOUNDS FOR USE IN THERAPEUTICS AND VACCINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.03.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Revocation of patent | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valneva Austria GmbH Campus Vienna Biocenter 3 1030 Vienna / AT | [2016/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Möhlen, Michael Bernardgasse 7/13 1070 Wien / AT | 02 /
Weber, Michael Rechte Wienzeile 249/15 1120 Wien / AT | 03 /
Wruss, Jürgen Dampfgasse 25/27-29 1100 Wien / AT | 04 /
Schlegl, Robert Rosental 63 2500 Siegenfeld / AT | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | Dempster, Robert Charles Script IP Limited Suite J Anchor House School Close, Chandlers Ford Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 4DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/51] | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 16183076.5 | 06.12.2012 | [2016/51] | Priority number, date | EP20110192230 | 06.12.2011 Original published format: EP 11192230 | WO2012EP54387 | 13.03.2012 Original published format: PCT/EP2012/054387 | [2016/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3106176 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3106176 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12, A61K39/39 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
A61K39/39 (EP);
A61K39/104 (EP);
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61K47/02 (EP);
A61K2039/5252 (EP);
A61K2039/55505 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] | Title | German: | ALUMINIUMVERBINDUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG FÜR THERAPEUTIKA UND IMPFSTOFFE | [2016/51] | English: | ALUMINIUM COMPOUNDS FOR USE IN THERAPEUTICS AND VACCINES | [2016/51] | French: | COMPOSÉS D'ALUMINIUM POUR UTILISATION DANS DES PRODUITS THÉRAPEUTIQUES ET VACCINS | [2016/51] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 05.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12795830.4 / EP2788023 | Divisional application(s) | EP17185526.5 / EP3269386 | EP20184308.3 / EP3785730 | EP24167413.4 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.07.2018
ADMISSIBLE Sanofi Pasteur 14 Espace Henri Vallée 69007 Lyon / FR Opponent's representative Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51 avenue Jean Jaurès BP 7073 69301 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR | [2018/33] | 26.07.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.02.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.03.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.05.2020 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.05.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 20.03.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/17] | Appeal following opposition | 10.08.2020 | Appeal received No. T1684/20 | 08.10.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.03.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 10.03.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 07.08.2020 | Appeal received No. T1684/20 | 07.10.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.03.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 10.03.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2019/19] |
Former [2018/27] | BG | 11.01.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005158334 (CONTORNI MARIO [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009158284 (MAYO FOUNDATION [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 5, line 1 - line 19 *; | [A] - SRIVASTAVA A K ET AL, "A purified inactivated Japanese encephalitis virus vaccine made in vero cells", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, vol. 19, no. 31, ISSN 0264-410X, (20010814), pages 4557 - 4565, (20010814), XP027321987 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 4560, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 4561, column r, paragraph l - page 4562, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 4563, column r, paragraph l; table 5 * * page 4564, column r, paragraph l * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Rehydragel Adjuvants. Product profile", (2008), pages 1 - 2, General Chemical, URL: http://www.generalchemical.com/assets/pdf/Rehydragel_Adjuvants_Product_Profile.pdf, (20121008), XP002684848 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [AD] - LINDBLAD, EB, "Special feature. Aluminium compounds for use in vaccines", IMMUNOL. AND CELL BIOL., (2004), vol. 82, pages 497 - 505, XP008151421 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.0818-9641.2004.01286.x | [AD] - LI S; SCHONEICH C; BORCHARDT RT, "Chemical instability of protein pharmaceuticals: Mechanisms of oxidation and strategies for stabilization.", BIOTECHNOL BIOENG., (19951205), vol. 48, no. 5, pages 490 - 500, XP055040145 [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * page 491, column l, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 497, column r, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260480511 | [A] - TIA ESTEY ET AL, "Evaluation of chemical degradation of a trivalent recombinant protein vaccine against botulinum neurotoxin by LysC peptide mapping and MALDI-TOF mass spectrometry", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (20090901), vol. 98, no. 9, doi:10.1002/jps.21543, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 2994 - 3012, XP055040203 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2995, column l, paragraph 1 - column r, paragraph 1 * * page 2996, column r, paragraph 2 - page 2997, column l, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.21543 | [T] - ROBERT SCHLEGL ET AL, "Influence of elemental impurities in aluminum hydroxide adjuvant on the stability of inactivated Japanese Encephalitis vaccine, IXIARO", VACCINE, GB, (20151101), vol. 33, no. 44, doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2015.05.103, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 5989 - 5996, XP055315021 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2015.05.103 | by applicant | US4057685 | US4459286 | US4663160 | US4673574 | US4695624 | US4761372 | US4761283 | US4808700 | US4882317 | US4965338 | EP0497524 | EP0497525 | US5308835 | WO9814401 | WO9842375 | WO0010599 | WO02064162 | CN101734698 | - LINDBLAD, EB, IMMUNOL. AND CELL BIOL., (2004), vol. 82, pages 497 - 505 | - BURNOUF T, VOX SANG, (1991), vol. 60, pages 8 - 15 | - EXLEY, C, TRENDS IN IMMUNOL, (2010), vol. 31, pages 103 - 109 | - JONES ET AL., AN. ACAD. BRAS. CIENC, (2005), vol. 77, no. 2, pages 293 - 324 | - ROBBINS ET AL., JAMA, (1996), vol. 276, no. 14, pages 1181 - 5 | - GEVER ET AL., MED. MICROBIOL. IMMUNOL, (1979), vol. 165, pages 171 - 288 | - ALIPAZAGA MV; MORENO RGM; COICHEV N, "Synergistic effect of Ni(II) and Co(II) ions on the sulphite induced autoxidation of Cu(II)/tetraglycine complex", DALTON TRANS, (2004), vol. 13, pages 2036 - 2040 | - ARUNEE WITTAYANUKULLUK; DONGPING JIANG; FRED E. REGNIER; STANLEY L. HEM, "Effect of microenvironment pH of aluminum hydroxide adjuvant on the chemical stability of adsorbed antigen", VACCINE, (2004), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2003.09.037, pages 1172 - 1176, XP004493380 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2003.09.037 | - BERGLUND J; FRONAEUS S; ELDING LI., "Kinetics and mechanism for manganese-catalyzed oxidation of sulfur(IV) by oxygen in aqueous solution", INORG CHEM, (1993), vol. 32, pages 4527 - 4538 | - BRANDT C; ELDING LI., "Role of chromium and vanadium in the atmospheric oxidation of sulfur (IV", ATMOS ENVIRON, (1998), vol. 32, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/S1352-2310(97)00331-2, pages 797 - 800, XP004890864 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1352-2310(97)00331-2 | - ITO, KIMIKO; KAWANASHI, SHOSUKE, "Site-specific fragmentation and modification of Albumin by sulphite in presence of metal ions or peroxidase/HzOz: Role of Sulphate radical", BIOCHEM AND BIOPHYS RES COMM., (1991), vol. 176, pages 1306 - 1312 | - HUIE R.E.; NETA P, "One-electron redox reaction in aqueous solutions of sulphite with hydroquinone and other hydroxyphenols", J. PHYS. CHEM., (1985), vol. 89, no. 18, pages 3918 - 3921 | - KALINA RANGUELOVA; MARCELO G. BONINI; RONALD P. MASON, "Bi)sulphite Oxidation by Copper,Zinc-Superoxide Dismutase: Sulphite- Derived, Radical-Initiated Protein Radical Formation", ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH PERSPECTIVES, (2010), vol. 118, no. 7, pages 970 - 975 | - LAMBETH D.O.; PALMER G., "The kinetics and mechanism of reduction of electron transfer proteins and other compounds of biological interest by dithionite", J.BIOCHEM. CHEM, (1973), vol. 248, pages 6095 - 6103 | - LI S; SCHONEICH C; BORCHARDT RT., "Chemical instability of protein pharmaceuticals: Mechanisms of oxidation and strategies for stabilization", BIOTECHNOL BIOENG, (19951205), vol. 48, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1002/bit.260480511, pages 490 - 500, XP055040145 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260480511 | - LIMA S; BONIFACIO RL; AZZELLINI GC; COICHEV N, "Ruthenium(II) tris(bipyridyl) ion as a luminescent probe for oxygen uptake on the catalyzed oxidation of HS0", TALANTA, (2002), vol. 56, pages 547 - 556 | - MAYO JC; TAN DX; SAINZ RM; NATARAJAN M; LOPEZ-BURILLO S; REITER RJ, "Protection against oxidative protein damage induced by metal-catalyzed reaction or alkylperoxyl radicals: comparative effects of melatonin and other antioxidants", BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (20030317), vol. 1620, no. 1-3, doi:doi:10.1016/S0304-4165(02)00527-5, pages 139 - 50, XP004410890 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-4165(02)00527-5 | - NETA P; HUIE R.E, "Free Radical Chemistry of Sulphite", ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH PERSPECTIVES, (1985), vol. 64, pages 209 - 217 | - SHI X, "Generation of SO and OH radicals in SO reactions with inorganic environmental pollutants and its implications to SO toxicity", J INORG BIOCHEM, (1994), vol. 56, no. 3, pages 155 - 165 | - STADTMAN ER, "Metal ion-catalyzed oxidation of proteins: biochemical mechanism and biological consequences", FREE RADIC BIOL MED., (1990), vol. 9, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/0891-5849(90)90006-5, pages 315 - 25, XP023548593 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0891-5849(90)90006-5 | - LIN C.-W; WU W.-C., J VIROL., (2003), vol. 77, no. 4, pages 2600 - 6 | - LIN C.-W; WU W.-C, J VIROL., (2003), vol. 77, no. 4, pages 2600 - 6 | Opposition | WO2013083726 | - "DULTAVAX, suspension injectable en seringue préremplie. Vaccin diphtérique, tétanique et poliomyélitique (inactivé), (adsorbé)", ansm, (20101112), page 7pp, XP055604556 | - "Résumé des caractéristiques du produit", l'ANSM, (20101112), DULTAVAX®, URL: http://agence- prd.ansm.sante.fr/php/ecodex/rcp/R0184995.htm#Rcp_2_Compo QualitQuanti_1, XP055604565 | - rapport d'analyse du lot FA 353455 de gel d'hydroxyde d'aluminium hydraté | - "Plus simple. Plus rapide. Plus precis. Passez a un niveau superieur d'ICP-MS. ICP-MS Agilent Serie 7500", Agilent Technologies, (20070000), pages 1 - 12, XP055605038 | - "ICP-MS", Université de Manchester, (20110823), page 7pp, Williamson Research Centre wiki, URL: http://wiki.manchester.ac.uk/wrc/index.php/ICP-MS, XP556050500 | - "Vaccine Recall Ixiaro - Japanese Encephalitis", (20110614), page 2pp, Travel Clinic Blog, URL: http://www.travelclinic.ltd.uk/blog/post/2011/06/14/VACCINE-RECALL-Ixiaro-Japa..., XP055605060 | - Anonymous, "Assessment report for Ixiaro Common Name: Japanese Encephalitis Vaccine (inactivated, adsorbed) Procedure No. EMEA/H/C/000963", EMA, (20090000), pages 1 - 50, XP055605067 | - "Assessment report for IXIARO Review under Article 20 of Regulation (EC) No 726/ 2004 INN: Japanese encephalitis virus strain SA 14-14- 2 Procedure number: EMEA/H/C/963/A-20/0029", EMA, (20120525), pages 1 - 8, XP055605071 | - MIYAKI et al., "Production of H5N1 (NIBRG-14) inactivated whole virus and split virion influenza vaccines and analysis of immunogenicity in mice using différent adjuvant formulations", Vaccine, (20100000), vol. 28, doi:doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2010.01.044, pages 2505 - 2509, XP026944260 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2010.01.044 | - REEMERS et al., "Reduced immune reaction prevents immunopathology after challenge with avian influenza virus: A transcriptomics analysis of adjuvanted vaccines", Vaccine, (20100000), vol. 28, pages 6351 - 6360, XP027211946 | - "Aluminium hydroxide, hydrated, for adsorption", EUROPEAN PHARMACOPOEIA 6.1, (20080401), pages 3395 - 3396, XP055605179 | - "ALUMINIUM (CHLORURE D') HEXAHYDRATE", PHARMACOPEE EUROPEENNE 9.0, (20170100), pages 1806 - 1807, XP055605074 | - "Denomination du medicament AVAXIM 80 U PEDIATRIQUE, suspension injectable en recipient multidose vaccin inactive de l'hepatite A adsorbe", ANSM, (20100121), page 6pp, URL: http://agence-prd.ansm.sante.fr/php/ecodex/notice/NO171574.htm, XP055605192 | - C. SCOTT, "Formulation Development - Making the Medicine", BioProcess International, (20060300), pages 42 - 56, XP055605197 | - "Osmium", Inorganic Ventures, (20130101), URL: www.inorqanicventures.com/element/osmium, XP055605207 | - A. SOYSAL et al., "Interchangeability of a hepatitis A vaccine second dose: Avaxim 80 following a first dose of Vaqta 25 or Havrix 720 in children in Turkey", Eur. J. Pedatr., (20070000), vol. 166, pages 533 - 539, XP019517692 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00431-007-0432-0 | - "IXIARO suspension injectableVaccin de l'encephalite japonaise (inactivé,adsorbé)", medikamio, (20100300), XP055605220 |