blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3165484

EP3165484 - MEDIA DESKEW [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.04.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.11.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NCR Corporation
864 Spring St. NW
Atlanta, GA 30308-1007 / US
[2018/20]
Former [2017/19]For all designated states
NCR Corporation
3097 Satellite Blvd.
Duluth, Georgia 30096 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gillier, Jason
310 Bluevale St. N
Unit D
Waterloo, Ontario N2J 4G3 / CA
02 / Widsten, Benjamin
37 Rolling Acres Drive
Kitchener, Ontario N2A 3W6 / CA
03 / Dunn, Frank
589 Glen Manor Blvd.
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 4T7 / CA
 [2017/19]
Representative(s)Secerna LLP
The Old Fire Station
18 Clifford Street
York YO1 9RD / GB
[2020/20]
Former [2017/19]MacLeod, Roderick William
NCR Limited
Intellectual Property Section
Discovery Centre
3 Fulton Road
Dundee Tayside, DD2 4SW / GB
Application number, filing date16183390.009.08.2016
[2017/19]
Priority number, dateUS20151492796030.10.2015         Original published format: US201514927960
[2017/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3165484
Date:10.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3165484
Date:13.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.2017
ClassificationIPC:B65H7/02, B65H9/16
[2017/19]
CPC:
B65H9/166 (EP,US); B65H9/16 (US); B65H7/02 (EP,US);
G07D11/16 (CN); B65H2301/331 (US); B65H2403/80 (EP,US);
B65H2403/942 (EP,US); B65H2404/1442 (EP,US); B65H2404/166 (US);
B65H2511/20 (EP,US); B65H2513/41 (EP,US); B65H2601/2531 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1912 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
B65H2511/20, B65H2220/02 (US,EP);
B65H2513/41, B65H2220/01 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/51]
Former [2017/19]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:MEDIENAUSRICHTUNG[2017/19]
English:MEDIA DESKEW[2017/19]
French:CORRECTION DE DÉSALIGNEMENT DE SUPPORT[2017/19]
Examination procedure09.08.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.11.2017Examination requested  [2017/51]
17.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2020Fee for grant paid
07.04.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.04.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)16.02.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
02.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.08.2016
AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CY13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
MK13.05.2020
MT13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SI13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
TR13.05.2020
IE09.08.2020
LU09.08.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
BE31.08.2020
CH31.08.2020
LI31.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
[2022/32]
Former [2022/27]HU09.08.2016
AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CY13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
MT13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SI13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
TR13.05.2020
IE09.08.2020
LU09.08.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
BE31.08.2020
CH31.08.2020
LI31.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/37]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SI13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
IE09.08.2020
LU09.08.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
BE31.08.2020
CH31.08.2020
LI31.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/36]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SI13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
LU09.08.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
BE31.08.2020
CH31.08.2020
LI31.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/24]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SI13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
LU09.08.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
CH31.08.2020
LI31.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/20]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
LU09.08.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
CH31.08.2020
LI31.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/18]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/10]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/09]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/08]AL13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/04]AL13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/01]FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/51]FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/50]FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/48]FI13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/47]LT13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
Former [2020/46]IS13.09.2020
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2229711  (UNISYS CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 24 - page 5, line 9; figures 1-4 *;
 [XA]EP0469866  (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1,4 * column 1, line 5 - line 21 * * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 13; figures 1-5 * [A] 2,3,5-15;
 [XA]DE102008038771  (WINCOR NIXDORF INT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-6 * [A] 2,3,5-15;
 [A]EP2305585  (NCR CORP [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0010]; figures 1-14 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.