Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3130724

EP3130724 - FLOOR PROFILE ASSEMBLY AND BASE PROFILE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.10.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.07.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK, SM
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Küberit Profile Systems GmbH & Co. KG
Römerweg 9
58513 Lüdenscheid / DE
[2017/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Holtschmidt, Olaf
Jahnstraße 25
58809 Neuenrade / DE
 [2018/27]
Former [2017/07]01 / Holtschmidt, Olaf
Jahnstrasse 25
58809 Neuenrade / DE
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/07]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date16183408.009.08.2016
[2017/07]
Priority number, dateDE20151011334913.08.2015         Original published format: DE102015113349
[2017/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3130724
Date:15.02.2017
Language:DE
[2017/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3130724
Date:04.07.2018
Language:DE
[2018/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:E04F19/06, E04F15/02
[2017/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/34]
Former [2017/07]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:FUSSBODENPROFILANORDNUNG UND BASISPROFIL[2017/07]
English:FLOOR PROFILE ASSEMBLY AND BASE PROFILE[2017/07]
French:SYSTÈME DE PROFILE DE SOL ET PROFILE DE BASE[2018/12]
Former [2017/07]SYSTEME DE PROFILE DE SOL ET PROFILE DE BASE
Examination procedure09.08.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/34]
30.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.05.2018Fee for grant paid
28.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)05.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
SM04.07.2018
LU09.08.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/24]AL04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
LU09.08.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AL04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
LU09.08.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AL04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
LU09.08.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AL04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/11]CZ04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
HR04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/10]CZ04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RS04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
NO04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NO04.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT04.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE202012100290U  (DOELLKEN & CO GMBH W [DE]) [X] 1-5,16 * figures 2-7 * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * [Y] 6-8,17;
 [Y]WO9717514  (RAVENSCROFT PLASTICS [GB], et al) [Y] 6,7 * figure 1 * * page 5, line 3 - line 14 *;
 [Y]US5073430  (AIDAN S BRUCE [GB]) [Y] 8 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 17 - line 19 * * column 4, line 26 - line 28 *;
 [YD]EP1682735  (KUENNE HERMANN FRIEDRICH GMBH [DE]) [YD] 15,17 * figures 14a-c * * claims 15-16 *;
 [XY]WO2005042875  (FRANCE NEIL [GB]) [X] 9-14 * figures 2,5 * * page 4, line 11 - line 15 * * page 4, line 22 - line 24 * * page 5, line 10 - line 23 * * page 6, line 19 - line 23 * [Y] 15
by applicantEP1682735
 DE202008000534U
 DE3420805
 EP1680563