Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3205299

EP3205299 - LOCKING MECHANISM TO SECURE ENDS OF AN IMPLANTABLE FABRIC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.02.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Microfixation, LLC
1520 Tradeport Drive
Jacksonville, FL 32229 / US
[2017/33]
Inventor(s)01 / GARCIA, Saddy, R.
841 Gerona Road
St. Augustine, FL 32086 / US
 [2017/33]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2017/33]
Application number, filing date16183466.829.06.2012
[2017/33]
Priority number, dateUS201161502615P29.06.2011         Original published format: US 201161502615 P
[2017/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3205299
Date:16.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/80
[2017/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/13]
Former [2017/33]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERRIEGELUNGSMECHANISMUS ZUR BEFESTIGUNG DER ENDEN EINES GEWEBEIMPLANTATS[2017/33]
English:LOCKING MECHANISM TO SECURE ENDS OF AN IMPLANTABLE FABRIC[2017/33]
French:MÉCANISME DE BLOCAGE DESTINÉ À FIXER LES EXTRÉMITÉS D'UN TISSU IMPLANTABLE[2017/33]
Examination procedure09.08.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.12.2016Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
22.12.2016Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
16.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/13]
09.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12804228.0  / EP2725998
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
09.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
09.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
04.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]US6682533  (DINSDALE MICHAEL C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 10, line 21 - line 37; figures 9-11 *;
 [A]US6099527  (HOCHSCHULER STEPHEN H [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US2006217713  (SERHAN HASSAN A [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 7A *