Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3133115

EP3133115 - POLYMER-ENCAPSULATED CARBON BLACK: PROCESS FOR ITS PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.08.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
King Abdulaziz City for Science and Technology
The National Center for
Technology Development
P.O.Box 6086
11442 Riyadh / SA
[2017/08]
Inventor(s)01 / BASFAR, Ahmed
KACST
Area (1), Villa (30)
King Abdullah Road
KACST Housing Complex, Al-Raed Distric
11442 RIYADH / SA
02 / MAITI, Jatindranath
P.O. Box Chandkuri
Vill-Talda
Dist: Pashim Medinipur
West Bengal
721467 TALDA / IN
 [2017/08]
Representative(s)Peguet, Wilfried , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63 avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/08]Peguet, Wilfried , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
Application number, filing date16183671.311.08.2016
[2017/08]
Priority number, dateUS20151482726114.08.2015         Original published format: US201514827261
[2017/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3133115
Date:22.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:C08K9/10, G03G9/08, G03G9/09, C08F112/08, C08F212/08, C08F2/22, C08F2/44, C08K3/04, C08K3/00, G03G9/093, C08J3/12, C08J3/20
[2017/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/38]
Former [2017/08]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYMERVERKAPSELTER KOHLENSTOFFRUSS: VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON[2017/08]
English:POLYMER-ENCAPSULATED CARBON BLACK: PROCESS FOR ITS PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF[2017/08]
French:NOIR DE CARBONE ENCAPSULÉ DANS UN POLYMÈRE,{J}SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET SON UTILISATION[2017/08]
Examination procedure11.08.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.08.2017Examination requested  [2017/38]
01.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201803   M06   Fee paid on   31.12.2018
31.08.201904   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US6190820  (PATEL RAJ D [CA] ET AL) [X] 1-19 * example IV * * page 1, lines 40-43 *
 [X]US2012129088  (KMIECIK-LAWRYNOWICZ GRAZYNA E [US] ET AL) [X] 1-19 * examples 1, 2 *
 EP0209879  [ ]
 US6544706  [ ]
 US5219943  [ ] (AKASAKI)
 US6458501  [ ] (CHIEH-MIN CHENG)
 [X]  - ZHOU YANYANG ET AL, "Encapsulation and dispersion of carbon black by an in situ controlling radical polymerization of AA/BA/St with DPE as a control agent", COLLOID & POLYMER SCIENCE, SPRINGER VERLAG, HEIDELBERG, DE, vol. 291, no. 10, doi:10.1007/S00396-013-2982-1, ISSN 0303-402X, (20130526), pages 2399 - 2408, (20130526), XP035320689 [X] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00396-013-2982-1
 [X]  - CASADO ET AL, "Polymer encapsulation of surface-modified carbon blacks using surfactant-free emulsion polymerisation", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, (20070414), vol. 48, no. 9, doi:10.1016/J.POLYMER.2007.02.063, ISSN 0032-3861, pages 2554 - 2563, XP022043334 [X] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymer.2007.02.063