Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3138910

EP3138910 - CRISPR-BASED GENOME MODIFICATION AND REGULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.07.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.04.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sigma-Aldrich Co. LLC
3050 Spruce Street
St. Louis, MO 63103 / US
[2017/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Chen, Fuqiang
3050 Spruce Street
St. Louis, MO 63103 / US
02 / Davis, Gregory D.
3050 Spruce Street
St. Louis, MO 63103 / US
 [2017/30]
Former [2017/10]01 / Chen, Fuqiang
3050 Spruce Street
St. Louis, MO 63103 / US
02 / Davis, Gregory D.
3050 Spruce Street
St. Louis, MO 63103 / US
03 / Kang, Qiaohua
3050 Spruce Street
St. Louis, MO 63103 / US
04 / Knight, Scott W.
3050 Spruce Street
St. Louis, MO 63103 / US
Representative(s)Greaves Brewster LLP
Copa House
Station Road
Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/10]Spinner, David Richard , et al
Greaves Brewster LLP
Copa House
Station Road
Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB
Application number, filing date16183723.205.12.2013
[2017/10]
Priority number, dateUS201261734256P06.12.2012         Original published format: US 201261734256 P
US201361758624P30.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361758624 P
US201361761046P05.02.2013         Original published format: US 201361761046 P
US201361794422P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361794422 P
[2017/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3138910
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3138910
Date:20.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.02.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/10, C12N15/63, C12N9/22
[2017/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/20]
Former [2017/10]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:CRISPR-BASIERTE GENOMMODIFIZIERUNG UND -REGULIERUNG[2017/10]
English:CRISPR-BASED GENOME MODIFICATION AND REGULATION[2017/10]
French:MODIFICATION ET RÉGULATION DE GÉNOME À BASE DE CRISPR[2017/10]
Examination procedure11.08.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/20]
02.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2017Fee for grant paid
02.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13859964.2  / EP2928496
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.12.2017  27.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 02  29.03.2018  21.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack, et al
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  12.04.2018  26.04.2018  WITHDRAWN
Caribou Biosciences, Inc.
2929 7th Street, Suite 105
Berkeley, CA 94710 / US
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 04  13.06.2018  19.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
 05  19.06.2018  22.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Str. 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
 06  20.06.2018  25.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Murphy, Colm Damien
Cooley (UK) LLP
Dashwood
69 Old Broad Street
London EC2M 1QS / GB
Opponent's representative
Cooley (UK) LLP
Dashwood
69 Old Broad Street
London EC2M 1QS / GB
 07  20.06.2018  25.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 08  20.06.2018  25.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Pohlman, Sandra M.
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molina & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstraße 16
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Pohlman, Sandra M.
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
 09  20.06.2018  25.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Mathys & Squire
The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Opponent's representative
Wilding, James Roger, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
 10  20.06.2018  27.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Rahmstorf, Claudia
Rechsanwältin / German Attorney at Law
Hans-Hinrichs-Strasse 33
32756 Detmold / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 [2019/34]
Former [2018/31]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2017  27.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 02  29.03.2018  21.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack, et al
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  12.04.2018  26.04.2018  WITHDRAWN
Caribou Biosciences, Inc.
2929 7th Street, Suite 105
Berkeley, CA 94710 / US
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 04  13.06.2018  19.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
 05  19.06.2018  22.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Str. 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
 06  20.06.2018  25.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Murphy, Colm Damien
Cooley (UK) LLP
Dashwood
69 Old Broad Street
London EC2M 1QS / GB
Opponent's representative
Cooley (UK) LLP
Dashwood
69 Old Broad Street
London EC2M 1QS / GB
 07  20.06.2018  25.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 08  20.06.2018  25.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Pohlman, Sandra M.
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molina & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstraße 16
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Pohlman, Sandra M.
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
 09  20.06.2018  25.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Mathys & Squire LLP
The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Opponent's representative
Wilding, James Roger, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
 10  20.06.2018  27.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Rahmstorf, Claudia
Rechsanwältin / German Attorney at Law
Hans-Hinrichs-Strasse 33
32756 Detmold / DE
Former [2018/30]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2017   
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 02  29.03.2018  21.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack, et al
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  12.04.2018  26.04.2018  WITHDRAWN
Caribou Biosciences, Inc.
2929 7th Street, Suite 105
Berkeley, CA 94710 / US
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 04  13.06.2018  19.06.2018  ADMISSIBLE
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
 05  19.06.2018   
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Str. 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
 06  20.06.2018   
Murphy, Colm Damien
Cooley (UK) LLP
Dashwood
69 Old Broad Street
London EC2M 1QS / GB
Opponent's representative
Cooley (UK) LLP
Dashwood
69 Old Broad Street
London EC2M 1QS / GB
 07  20.06.2018   
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 08  20.06.2018   
Pohlman, Sandra M.
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molina & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstraße 16
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Pohlman, Sandra M.
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
 09  20.06.2018   
Mathys & Squire LLP
The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Opponent's representative
Wilding, James Roger, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2018/29]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2017   
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 02  29.03.2018   
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack, et al
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  12.04.2018  26.04.2018  WITHDRAWN
Caribou Biosciences, Inc.
2929 7th Street, Suite 105
Berkeley, CA 94710 / US
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 04  13.06.2018   
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Former [2018/23]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2017   
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 02  29.03.2018   
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack, et al
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  12.04.2018  26.04.2018  WITHDRAWN
Caribou Biosciences, Inc.
2929 7th Street, Suite 105
Berkeley, CA 94710 / US
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
Former [2018/21]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2017   
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 02  29.03.2018   
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack, et al
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 03  12.04.2018   
Caribou Biosciences, Inc.
2929 7th Street, Suite 105
Berkeley, CA 94710 / US
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
Former [2018/19]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2017   
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 02  29.03.2018   
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack, et al
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2018/06]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2017   
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
20.05.2018No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
20.05.2018No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
20.06.2018No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
20.06.2018No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
18.07.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.03.2019Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.12.2013
HR20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
MT05.12.2017
BG20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
[2019/41]
Former [2019/37]HU05.12.2013
HR20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
MT05.12.2017
BG20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2019/31]HU05.12.2013
HR20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
MT05.12.2017
BG20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2019/30]HR20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
MT05.12.2017
BG20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/43]HR20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
MT05.12.2017
BG20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/27]HR20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/12]HR20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/11]HR20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]US2010076057  (SONTHEIMER ERIK J [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [AP]WO2013176772  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [AP] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO2014065596  (TOOLGEN INC [KR]) [E] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO2014099744  (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [E] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO2014093655  (BROAD INST INC [US], et al) [E] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - R. SAPRANAUSKAS ET AL, "The Streptococcus thermophilus CRISPR/Cas system provides immunity in Escherichia coli", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, GB, (20110803), vol. 39, no. 21, doi:10.1093/nar/gkr606, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 9275 - 9282, XP055265024 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkr606
 [A]  - M. JINEK ET AL, "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity", SCIENCE, US, (20120817), vol. 337, no. 6096, doi:10.1126/science.1225829, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 816 - 821, XP055229606 [A] 1-16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    [ ] - M. JINEK ET AL, "Supplementary Materials for A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity", SCIENCE, US, (20120628), vol. 337, no. 6096, doi:10.1126/science.1225829, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1 - 37, XP055067747

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
 [A]  - DANA CARROLL, "A CRISPR Approach to Gene Targeting", MOLECULAR THERAPY, (20120901), vol. 20, no. 9, doi:10.1038/mt.2012.171, ISSN 1525-0016, pages 1658 - 1660, XP055106489 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2012.171
 [AP]  - MARTIN JINEK ET AL, "RNA-programmed genome editing in human cells", ELIFE, GB, (20130129), vol. 2, doi:10.7554/eLife.00471, ISSN 2050-084X, pages e00471 - 1, XP055245475 [AP] 1-16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471
 [AP]  - LEI S. QI ET AL, "Repurposing CRISPR as an RNA-Guided Platform for Sequence-Specific Control of Gene Expression", CELL, US, (20130201), vol. 152, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2013.02.022, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 1173 - 1183, XP055299671 [AP] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.02.022
by applicant   - CONG ET AL., SCIENCE, vol. 339, pages 819 - 823
    - ISELI ET AL., PLOS ONE, vol. 2, no. 6, page E579
    - JINEK ET AL., SCIENCE, vol. 337, pages 816 - 821
    - LANGE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2007), vol. 282, pages 5101 - 5105
    - BELFORT ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3379 - 3388
    - MILLER ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL, vol. 25, pages 778 - 785
    - SZCZPEK ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL, (2007), vol. 25, pages 786 - 793
    - DOYON ET AL., NAT. METHODS, (2011), vol. 8, pages 74 - 81
    - BEERLI ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 135 - 141
    - PABO ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOCHEM, (2001), vol. 70, pages 313 - 340
    - ISALAN ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL, (2001), vol. 19, pages 656 - 660
    - SEGAL ET AL., CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL, (2001), vol. 12, pages 632 - 637
    - CHOO ET AL., CURR. OPIN. STRUCT. BIOL., (2000), vol. 10, pages 411 - 416
    - ZHANG ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, no. 43, pages 33850 - 33860
    - DOYON ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2008), vol. 26, pages 702 - 708
    - SANTIAGO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2008), vol. 105, pages 5809 - 5814
    - SANTIAGO ET AL., PNAS, (2008), vol. 105, pages 5809 - 5814
    - MOEHLE ET AL., PNAS, (2007), vol. 104, pages 3055 - 3060
    - URNOV ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 435, pages 646 - 651
    - LOMBARDO ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 25, pages 1298 - 1306
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADVANCES IN APPLIED MATHEMATICS, (1981), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489
    - DAYHOFF, Atlas of Protein Sequences and Structure, NATIONAL BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION, vol. 5, pages 353 - 358
    - GRIBSKOV, NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1986), vol. 14, no. 6, pages 6745 - 6763
OppositionUS201261734256P  * "the first priority filing" *
 US201361758624P  * "the second priority filing" *
 US201361761046P  * "the third priority filing" *
 US201361794422P  * "the fourth priority filing" *
 WO2013176772
 US2005220796
 EP2800811
 WO2014065596
 WO2014089290
 US2013073307
 EP3138910
 WO2014089290  * (Parent Application as filed) *
    - JINEK, M. et al., "A programmable dual-RNA-guided DNA endonuclease in adaptive bacterial immunity", Science, (20120628), vol. 337, pages 816 - 821, XP055299674

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    - Jinek et al., "Supplementary Materials for A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity", Science, (08171220), vol. 337, pages 1 - 37, XP055067747

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    - Anonymous, "Plasmid: pSVK3", addgene, URL: http://www.addgene.org/vector-database/4288
    - NLS Mapper analysis of S. pyogenes Cas9
    - CONG, L. et al., "Multiplex genome engineering using CRISPR/Cas systems", Science, (20130103), vol. 339, pages 819 - 823, XP055067741

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
    - Cong et al., "Supplementary Material to : Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", Science, (01031320), vol. 339, no. 6121, pages 1 - 28, XP002730884

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
    - MALI, P. et al., "RNA-guided human genome engineering via Cas9", Science, (20130103), vol. 339, pages 823 - 826, XP055111247

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033
    - Mali et al., "Supplementary information for RNA-Guided Human Genome Engineering via Cas9", Science, (02151520), vol. 336, no. 6121, pages 1 - 36, XP002723674

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033
    - SANJANA, N., "A Transcription Activator-Like Effector (TALE) Toolbox for Genome Engineering", NIH Public Author Manuscript, (20120105), pages 171 - 192, XP055502289

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2011.431
    - DICARLO, J. et al., "Genome engineering in Saccharomyces cerevisiae using CRISPR/Cas systems", Nucl Acid Res., (20130304), vol. 41, no. 7, pages 4336 - 4343, XP055086617

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkt135
    - CHANG et al., "Genome editing with RNA-guided Cas9 nuclease in zebrafish embryos", Cell Research, (20130326), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 465 - 472, XP055251146

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.45
    - WANG et al., "One-step generation of mice carrying mutations in multiple genes by CRISPR/Cas- mediated genome engineering", Cell, (20130502), vol. 153, no. 4, pages 910 - 918, XP028538358

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.04.025
    - GRATZ et al., "Genome Engineering of Drosophila with the CRISPR RNA-Guided Cas9 Nuclease", Genetics, (08011320), vol. 194, pages 1029 - 1035, XP055102690

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.152710
    - BROUNS, S., "A Swiss army knife of immunity", Science, (20120817), vol. 337, no. 6096, pages 808 - 809, XP055113718

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1227253
    - CARROLL, D., "A CRISPR approach to gene targeting", Molecular Therapy, (20120900), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 1658 - 1660, XP055106489

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2012.171
    - BARRANGOU, R., "RNA-mediated programmable DNA cleavage", Nature Biotech ., (20120910), vol. 30, no. 9, pages 836 - 838, XP055118675

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2357
    - GASIUAS, G. et al., "Cas9-crRNA ribonucleoprotein complex mediates specific DNA cleavage for adaptive immunity in bacteria", Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci., (20120904), pages E2579 - E2586, XP055068588

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1208507109
    - CHRISTIAN, M. et al., "Targeting DNA double-strand breaks with TAL effector nucleases", Genetics, (20100726), vol. 186, pages 757 - 761, 1SI-8SI, XP002632806

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/GENETICS.110.120717
    - MILLER, J. C. et al., "A TALE nuclease architecture for efficient genome editing", Nat. Biotechnol., (20111222), vol. 29, pages 143 - 148, XP055458374

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1755
    - URNOV, F. et al., "Genome editing with engineered zinc finger nucleases", Nat. Rev. Gene, (20100900), vol. 11, pages 636 - 646, XP055198280

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg2842
    - CARROLL, D. et al., "Progress and prospects: Zinc-finger nucleases as gene therapy agents", Gene Ther., (20080911), vol. 15, pages 1463 - 1468, XP055041104

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/gt.2008.145
    - JOUNG, J. et al., "TALENS: a widely applicable technology for targeted genome editing", Nat. Rev. Mol. Cell Biol., (20121121), vol. 14, pages 49 - 55, XP055282847

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrm3486
    - YU et al., "Highly efficient genome modifications mediated by CRISPR/Cas9 in Drosophila", Genetics, (20130705), vol. 95, no. 1, pages 289 - 291, XP055242275

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.153825
    - HSU et al., "DNA targeting specificity of RNA-guided Cas9 nucleases", Nature Biotech, (20130721), vol. 31, no. 9, pages 827 - 834, XP055382777

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2647
    - Hsu et al., "Supplementary Information to DNA targeting specificity of RNA-guided Cas9 nuclease", Nature Biotechnology, vol. 31, no. 9, (20130901), pages 1 - 26, XP002718605

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2647
    - CHO, S. et al., "Targeted genome engineering in human cells with the Cas9 RNA-guided endonuclease (including supplementary information)", Nature Biotechnology, (20130129), vol. 31, pages 230 - 232, 1-11, XP002699850

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2507
    - JINEK, M. et al., "RNA-programmed genome editing in human cells", eLife, (20130129), pages 1 - 9+3pp, XP055285239

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471
    - SHEN et al., "Generation of gene -modified mice via Cas9/RNA-mediated gene targeting", Cell Research, (20130402), vol. 23, pages 720 - 723, XP055141533

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.46
    - ALBERTS, "Chapter 12 Intracellular compartments and protein sorting", Molecular Biology of the Cell, (20020101), pages 671 - 676, XP055486976
    - WARD et al., "Targeted integration of a rAAV vector into the AAVS1 region", Virology, (20120913), vol. 433, pages 356 - 366, XP055502331

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virol.2012.08.015
    - IRION et al., "Identification and targeting of the ROSA26 locus in human embryonic stem cells", Nat Biotech, (20071125), vol. 25, no. 12, pages 1477 - 1482, XP008111005

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1362
    - MINAMI et al., "Ets Motifs Are Necessary for Endothelial Cell -Specific Expression of a 723-bp Tie-2 Promoter/Enhancer in Hprt Targeted Transgenic Mice", Arterioscler Thromb Vasc Biol, (20031100), pages 2041 - 2047, XP055502336

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.ATV.0000089326.63053.9A
    - ZHANG et al., "Applications of mRNA injections for analyzing cell lineage and asymmetric cell divisions during segmentation in the leech Helobdella robusta", Development, (20050000), vol. 132, pages 2103 - 2013, XP055502340

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/dev.01802
    - REBAR et al., "Induction of angiogenesis in a mouse model using engineered transcription factors", Nature Medicine, (20020000), vol. 8, pages 1427 - 1432, XP002993087

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm795
    - CERMAK et al., "Efficient design and assembly of custom TALEN and other TAL effector-based constructs for DNA targeting", Nucleic Acids Res, (20110000), vol. 39, pages 1 - 11, XP055130093

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkr218
    - MALI, "RNA Guided Human Genome Engineering via Cas9", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, pages 823 - 826, XP055469277

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033
    - HWANG, "Efficient genome editing in zebrafish using a CRISPR-Cas system", Nature Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, pages 227 - 229, XP055086625

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2501
    - JINEK, "RNA-programmed genome editing in human cells (includes supplementary information)", Science, (20130000), vol. 337, pages 1 - 9+4PP, XP055285239

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471
    - CHO, "Targeted genome engineering in human cells with the Cas9 RNA-guided endonuclease (includes Supplementary information)", Nature Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, pages 230 - 232,1-11, XP002699850

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2507
    - DICARLO, Nucleic Acids Res, (20130000), vol. 41, pages 4336 - 4343, XP055086617

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkt135
    - CHANG, "Genome editing with RNA-guided Cas9 nuclease in Zebrafish embryos", Cell Research, (20130000), vol. 23, pages 465 - 472, XP055251146

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.45
    - WANE, "One-Step Generation of Mice Carrying Mutations in Multiple Genes by CRISPR/Cas-Mediated Genome Engineering", Cell, (20130000), vol. 153, pages 910 - 918, XP028538358

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.04.025
    - GRATZ, "Genome Engineering of Drosophila with the CRISPR RNA-Guided Cas9 Nuclease", Genetics, (20130000), vol. 194, pages 1029 - 1035, XP055102690

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.152710
    - NLS mapper
    - NOGUCHI, "PDX-1 protein containing its own antennapedia-like protein transduction domain can transduce pancreatic duct and islet cells", Diabetes, (20030000), vol. 52, pages 1732 - 37, XP002354481

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.52.7.1732
    - DEROSSI, "Cell Internalization of the Third Helix of the Antennapedia Homeodomain Is Receptor-independent", The Journal of Biological Biochemistry, (19960000), vol. 271, pages 18188 - 18193, XP002024485

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.30.18188
    - YANG, "HIV-1 TAT-mediated protein transduction and subcellular localization using novel expression vectors", FEBS Letters, (20020000), vol. 532, pages 36 - 44, XP004395339

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(02)03624-4
    - URL: http://www.addgene.org/vector- database/4288
    - URNOV, "Genome editing with engineered zinc finger nucleases", Nat. Rev. Gene, (20100000), vol. 11, pages 636 - 646, XP055198280

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg2842
    - JOUNG, "TALENs: a widely applicable technology for targeted genome editing", Nat. Rev. Mol. Cell Biol., (20130000), vol. 14, pages 49 - 55, XP055282847

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrm3486
    - CARROLL, "Genome Engineering With Zinc-Finger Nucleases", Genetics, (20110000), vol. 188, pages 773 - 782, XP055036700

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.111.131433
    - LIEBER, "The Mechanism of Double-Strand DNA Break Repair by the Nonhomologous DNA End-Joining Pathway", NIH Public Access Author Manuscript, (20100000), vol. 79, pages 1 - 34, XP055502406

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.biochem.052308.093131
    - PUCHTA, "The repair of double-strand breaks in plants: mechanisms and consequences for genome evolution", Journal of Experimental Botany, (20050000), vol. 56, no. 1, pages 1 - 14, XP002394840

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jxb/eri025
    - CHAPMAN, "Playing the End Game: DNA Double-Strand Break Repair Pathway Choice", Molecular Cell, (20120000), vol. 47, pages 497 - 510, XP055502422

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcel.2012.07.029
    - SALOMON et al., "Capture of genomic and T-DNA sequences during double-strand break repair in somatic plant cells", The EMBO Journal, (19980000), vol. 17, pages 6086 - 6095, XP002259898

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/17.20.6086
    - BIBIKOVA, "Enhancing gene targeting with designed zinc finger nucleases", Science, (20030000), vol. 300, page 764, XP002974267

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1079512
    - PORTEUS et al., "Chimeric nucleases stimulate gene targeting in human cells", Science, (20030000), vol. 300, page 763, XP002974231

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1078395
    - HOCKEMEVER, "Genetic engineering of human pluripotent cells using TALE nucleases", Nature Biotechnology, (20110000), vol. 29, pages 731 - 734, XP055265362

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1927
    - RUDIN et al., "Efficient repair of HO-induced chromosomal breaks in Saccharomyces cerevisiae by recombination between flanking homologous sequences.", Molecular and Cellular Biology, (19880900), vol. 8, pages 3918 - 3928, XP055502440

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.8.9.3918
    - ROUET, "Introduction of double-strand breaks into the genome of mouse cells by expression of a rare-cutting endonuclease.", Molecular and Cellular Biology, (19940000), vol. 14, pages 8096 - 8106, XP000572018
    - PATTERSON, "Codon optimization of bacterial luciferase (lux) for expression in mammalian cells", J Ind Microbiol. Biotechnol, (20050000), vol. 32, pages 115 - 123, XP002503994

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10295-005-0211-8
    - FREITAS, "Mechanisms and Signals for the Nuclear Import of Proteins", Current Genomics, (20090000), vol. 10, pages 550 - 557, XP055502464
    - SCHRAMM, Genes Dev, (20020000), vol. 16, pages 2593 - 2620, XP055183585
    - FOECKING, "Powerful and versatile enhancer-promoter unit for mammalian expression vectors", Gene, (19860000), pages 101 - 105, XP025688566

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(86)90137-X
    - REBAR, "Induction of angiogenesis in a mouse model using engineered transcription factors", Nature Medicine, (20020000), vol. 8, pages 1427 - 32, XP002993087

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm795
    - CERMAK, "Efficient design and assembly of custom TALEN and other TAL effector-based constructs for DNA targeting", Nucleic Acids Res, (20110000), vol. 39, pages 1 - 11, XP002659530

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkr218
    - JINEK, Science, (20120000), vol. 337, pages 816 - 820, XP055299674

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    - Jinek et al., "Supplementary Materials for A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity", Science, vol. 337, (20120817), pages 1 - 37, XP055067747

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    - URNOV, "Highly efficient endogenous human gene correction using designed zinc-finger nucleases", Nature, (20050000), vol. 435, pages 646 - 651, XP002411069

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature03556
    - MILLER, "A Tale nuclease architecture for efficient genome editing (includes Online Methods)", Nature Biotechnology, (20110000), vol. 29, pages 143 - 148+2PP, XP055285157

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1755
    - CARROLL, "Design, construction and in vitro testing of zinc finger nucleases", Nature Protocols, (20060000), vol. 1, pages 1329 - 1341, XP001539641

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2006.231
    - CARROLL, "Progress and prospects: Zinc-finger nucleases as gene therapy agents", Gene Therapy, (20080000), vol. 15, pages 1463 - 1468, XP055041104

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/gt.2008.145
    - BEDELL, "In vivo genome editing using a high-efficiency TALEN system", Nature, (20120000), vol. 491, pages 114 - 118, XP055048281

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature11537
    - CHRISTIAN, "Targeting DNA Double-Strand Breaks with TAL Effector Nucleases (plus supporting information)", Genetics, (20100000), vol. 186, pages 757 - 761,1SI-8SI, XP002632806

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/GENETICS.110.120717
    - PEREZ-PINERA, "Advances in Targeted Genome Editing", Curr Opin Chem Biol, (20120000), vol. 16, pages 268 - 77, XP055501592

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cbpa.2012.06.007
    - MAHFOUZ, "De novo-engineered transcription activator-like effector (TALE) hybrid nuclease with novel DNA binding specificity creates double-strand breaks", PNAS, (20110000), vol. 108, pages 2623 - 2628, XP055007615

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1019533108
    - BROUNS, "A Swiss Army Knife of Immunity", Science, (20120000), vol. 337, pages 808 - 809, XP055113718

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1227253
    - VILLION, "The double-edged sword of CRISPR-Cas systems", Cell Research, (20120000), vol. 23, pages 15 - 17, XP055086684

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2012.124
    - GOLIC, "RNA-Guided Nucleases: A New Era for Engineering the Genomes of Model and Nonmodel Organisms", Genetics, (20130000), vol. 195, pages 303 - 308, XP055340188

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.155093
    - XU, "The Next Generation Biotechnology for Apple Improvement and Beyond: The CRISPR/Cas9 Story", New York Fruit Quarterly, (20130000), vol. 21, pages 19 - 22, XP055340191
    - CUI, "Targeted integration in rat and mouse embryos with zinc-finger nucleases", Nat Biotechnol, (20110000), vol. 29, pages 64 - 67, XP055065200

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1731
    - MOEHLE, "Targeted gene addition into a specified location in the human genome using designed zinc finger nucleases (plus Corrections)", PNAS, (20070403), vol. 104, no. 14, pages 3055 - 3060+6090, XP002518477

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0611478104
    - ORLANDO, "Zinc-finger nuclease-driven targeted integration into mammalian genomes using donors with limited chromosomal homology", Nucleic Acid Res, (20100000), vol. 38, pages 1 - 15, XP055076783

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkq512
    - LI, "In vivo genome editing restores haemostasis in a mouse model of haemophilia", HHS Public Access Author Manuscript, (20110000), vol. 475, pages 1 - 20, XP055502541

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature10177
    - MARESCA, "Obligate Ligation-Gated Recombination (ObLiGaRe): Custom-designed nuclease-mediated targeted integration through nonhomologous end joining", Genome Research, (20130000), vol. 23, pages 539 - 546, XP055077484

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.145441.112
    - CRISTEA, "In vivo cleavage of transgene donors promotes nuclease-mediated targeted integration", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (20130000), vol. 110, pages 871 - 880, XP055076901

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.24733
    - FIECK, "Modifications of the E. coli Lac repressor for expression in eukaryotic cells: effects of nuclear signal sequences on protein activity and nuclear acumulation", Nucleic Acids Res, (19920000), vol. 20, pages 1785 - 1791, XP002095852
    - FISCHER-FANTUZZI, "Cell-dependent efficiency of reiterated nuclear signals in a mutant simian virus 40 oncoprotein targeted to the nucleus", Mol Cell Biol, (19880000), vol. 8, pages 5495 - 5503, XP009140368

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.8.12.549
    - CHIU, "Engineered GFP as a vital reporter in plants", Curr Biol, (19960000), vol. 6, pages 325 - 330, XP000571865

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(02)00483-9
    - PLANEV, "Inhibition of Glucocorticoid-induced Apoptosis in 697 Pre-B Lymphocytes by the Mineralocorticoid Receptor N-terminal Domain", J Biol Chem, (20020000), vol. 277, pages 42188 - 42196, XP055251719

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M205085200
    - CAMPEAU, "A Versatile Viral System for Expression and Depletion of Proteins in Mammalian Cells", Plos One, (20090000), vol. 4, pages 1 - 18, XP055251120

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0006529
    - DAI, "The Transcription Factors GATA4 and dHAND Physically Interact to Synergistically Activate Cardiac Gene Expression through a p300-dependent Mechanism", J Biol Chem, (20020000), vol. 277, pages 24390 - 24398, XP055251716

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M202490200
    - LVSSENKO, "Cognate putative nuclear localization signal effects strong nuclear localization of a GFP reporter and facilitates gene expression studies in Caenorhabditis elegans", BioTechniques, (20070000), vol. 43, pages 596 - 600, XP055268137

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2144/000112615
    - LAUMONIER, "Lentivirus mediated HO-1 gene transfer enhances myogenic precursor cell survival after autologous transplantation in pig", Mol Ther, (20080000), vol. 16, pages 404 - 410, XP008159717

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.mt.6300354
    - BIZZARRI, "Fluorescence recovery after photobleaching reveals the biochemistry of nucleocytoplasmic exchange", Anal Bioanal Chem, (20120000), vol. 403, pages 2339 - 2351, XP035069015

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00216-012-6025-4
    - SOUILHOL, "Nas transgenic mouse line allows visualization of Notch pathway activity in vivo", Genesis, (20060600), vol. 44, no. 6, pages 277 - 286, XP055502571

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/dvg.20208
    - FURUTAMA, "Expression of the IP3R1 promoter-driven nls-lacZ transgene in Purkinje cell parasagittal arrays of developing mouse cerebellum", J Neurosci Res, (20100000), vol. 88, pages 2810 - 2825, XP055502574

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jnr.22451
    - MCCONNELL, "Nuclear and cytoplasmic LIMK1 enhances human breast cancer progression", Molecular Cancer, (20110000), vol. 10, page 75, XP021103688

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1476-4598-10-75
    - BEUMER, "Efficient gene targeting in Drosophila by direct embryo injection with zinc-finger nucleases", PNAS, (20080000), vol. 105, pages 19821 - 19826, XP002782686

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0810475105
    - HODEL, "Nuclear Localization Signal Receptor Affinity Correlates with in Vivo Localization in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", JBC, (20060000), vol. 281, pages 23545 - 23556, XP055502581

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M601718200
    - MILLER, "Human Gene Targeting by Adeno-Associated Virus Vectors Is Enhanced by DNA Double-Strand Breaks", Mol Cell Biol, (20030000), vol. 23, pages 3550 - 3557, XP055502623

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.23.10.3550-3557.2003
    - CHANG, "Microtubule-based localization of a synaptic calcium-signaling complex is required for left-right neuronal asymmetry in C. elegans", Development, (20110000), vol. 138, pages 3509 - 3518, XP055502632

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/dev.069740
    - LIANG, "Homology-directed repair is a major double-strand break repair pathway in mammalian cells.", PNAS, (19980000), vol. 95, pages 5172 - 5177, XP055502633
    - WARD, "Targeted integration of a rAAV vector into the AAVS1 region", Virology, (20120000), vol. 433, pages 356 - 366, XP055502331

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virol.2012.08.015
    - IRION, "Identification and targeting of the ROSA26 locus in human embryonic stem cells", Nature Biotechnology, (20070000), vol. 25, pages 1477 - 1482, XP008111005

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1362
    - MINAMI, "Ets Motifs Are Necessary for Endothelial Cell -Specific Expression of a 723-bp Tie-2 Promoter/Enhancer in Hprt Targeted Transgenic Mice", Arterioscler Thromb Vasc Biol, (20030000), vol. 23, pages 2041 - 2047, XP055502336

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.ATV.0000089326.63053.9A
    - ZHANG, "Applications of mRNA injections for analyzing cell lineage and asymmetric cell divisions during segmentation in the leech Helobdella robusta", Development, (20050000), vol. 132, pages 2103 - 2113, XP055502340

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/dev.01802
    - GOLDFARB, "Importin α: a multipurpose nuclear-transport receptor", Trends in Cell Biology, (20040000), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 505 - 514, XP004552656

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tcb.2004.07.016
    - GEURTS, "Knockout Rats via Embryo Microinjection of Zinc-Finger Nucleases", Science, (20090000), vol. 325, page 433, XP002580718

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/SCIENCE.1172447
    - TESSON, "Knockout rats generated by embryo microinjection of TALENS", Nat Biotechnol, (20110000), vol. 29, pages 695 - 696, XP002681970

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT.1940
    - KARRAN, "DNA double strand break repair in mammalian cells", Current Opinion in Genetics & Development (2000, (20000401), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 144 - 150, XP001206008

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-437X(00)00069-1
    - REMY, "Zinc-finger nucleases: a powerful tool for genetic engineering of animals", Transgenic Res, (20100000), vol. 19, page 363, XP019831645

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11248-009-9323-7
    - MUSSOLINI, "TALE nucleases: tailored genome engineering made easy", Curr Opinion Biotechnol, (20120000), vol. 23, pages 644 - 650, XP055071668

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.copbio.2012.01.013
    - JINEK, M. et al., "A programmable dual-RNA-guided DNA endonuclease in adaptive bacterial immunity", Science, (20120000), vol. 337, pages 816 - 821, XP055299674

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    - "Enabling Science to Improve the Quality of Life", Sigma-Aldrich Annual Report, (20120000), pages 1 - 92
    - BARRANGOU, "RNA-mediated programmable DNA cleavage", Nature Biotechnology, (20120000), vol. 30, no. 9, pages 836 - 838, XP055118675

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2357
    - CARROLL, D. A, "CRISPR Approach to Gene Targeting", Molecular Therapy, (20120000), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 1658 - 1660, XP055106489

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2012.171
    - URNOV, F.D. et al., "Genome editing with engineered zinc finger nucleases.", Nature Reviews Genetics, (20100000), vol. 11, pages 636 - 646, XP008150557

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg2842
    - PEREZ-PINERA, P., "Advances in Targeted Genome Editing.", NIH Public Access Author Manuscript, (20120000), vol. 16, no. 3-4, pages 1 - 18, XP055501592

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cbpa.2012.06.007
    - MALI, P. et al., "RNA-guided human genome engineering via Cas9", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, pages 823 - 826, XP055111247

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033
    - HWANG, W. et al., "Efficient genome editing in zebrafish using a CRISPR-Cas system", Nature Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, pages 227 - 229, XP055086625

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2501
    - J INEK, M. et al., "RNA-programmed genome editing in human cells", eLife, (20130000), pages 1 - 9, XP002699851

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471
    - CONG, L. et al., "Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, pages 819 - 823, XP055067741

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
    - "Versatile and Efficient Genome Editing in Human Cells by Combining Zinc-Finger Nucleases With Adeno-Associated Viral Vectors", Human Gene Therapy, (20120000), vol. 23, pages 321 - 329, XP002730956

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hum.2011.140
    - URNOV, F.D. et al., "Highly efficient endogenous human gene correction using zinc-finger nucleases", Nature, (20050000), vol. 435, pages 646 - 651, XP002467423

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature03556
    - PORTEUS, M.H. et al., "Gene targeting using zinc finger nucleases", Nature Biotechnology, (20050000), vol. 23, no. 8, pages 967 - 973, XP002467422

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1125
    - CHRISTIAN, M. et al., "Targeting DNA Double-Strand Breaks with TAL Effector Nucleases", Genetics, (20100000), vol. 186, pages 757 - 761,1SI-8SI, XP002632806

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/GENETICS.110.120717
    - DAVIS, G.D. et al., "Zinc Finger Nucleases for Genome Editing", Genetic Engineering & Biotechnology News, (20100000), vol. 30, no. 12, XP055340181
    - CARROLL, D., "Progress and prospects: zinc-finger nucleases as gene therapy agents", Gene Therapy, (20080000), vol. 15, pages 1463 - 1468, XP055041104

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/gt.2008.145
    - CARROLL, D., "Genome Engineering with Zinc-Finger Nucleases", Genetics, (20110000), vol. 188, pages 773 - 782, XP055036700

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.111.131433
    - CERMAK, T. et al., "Efficient design and assembly of custom TALEN and other TAL effector-based constructs for DNA targeting", Nucleic Acids Research, (20110000), vol. 39, no. 12, pages 1 - 11, XP002659530

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkr218
    - MILLER, J.C. et al., "A TALE nuclease architecture for efficient genome editing", Nature Biotechnology, (20110000), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 143 - 148, XP002685898

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1755
    - LI, T. et al., "Modularly assembled designer TAL effector nucleases for targeted gene knockout and gene replacement in eukaryotes", Nucleic Acids Research, (20110000), vol. 39, no. 14, pages 6315 - 6325, XP002680499

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/NAR/GKR188
    - MUSSOLINO, C. et al., "TALE nucleases: tailored genome engineering made easy", Current Opinion Biotechnology, (20120000), vol. 23, no. 5, pages 644 - 650
    - REYON, D. et al., "FLASH Assembly of TALENS Enables High-Throughput Genome Editing", HHS Public Access Author Manuscript, (20120000), vol. 30, no. 5, pages 1 - 23, XP055501683

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2170
    - BEDELL, V.M. et al., "In vivo genome editing using a high-efficiency TALEN system", Nature, (20120000), vol. 491, pages 114 - 118, XP055048281

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature11537
    - MAHFOUZ, M.M. et al., "De novo-engineered transcription activator-like effector (TALE) hybrid nuclease with novel DNA binding specificity creates double- strand breaks", PNAS, (20110000), vol. 108, no. 6, pages 2623 - 2628, XP055007615

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1019533108
    - Anonymous, "cNLS Mapper Result - report of predicted NLSs in the S. pyogenes Cas9 sequence generated using the online cNLS mapper algorithm", (20160425), URL: www.nls-mapper.iab.keio.ac.jp/cgi-bin/NLS_Mapper_y.cgi
    - JINEK, M et al., "A Programmable Dual-RNA- Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity", Science, (20120000), vol. 337, pages 816 - 821, XP055299674

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    - DELTCHEVA, E., "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III", Nature, (20110000), vol. 471, pages 602 - 607, XP055068535

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886
    - SAPRANAUSKAS, R., "The Streptococcus thermophilus CRISPR/Cas system provides immunity in Escherichia coli -useful background", Nucleic Acids Research, (20110000), vol. 39, no. 21, pages 9275 - 9282, XP055011535

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkr606
    - CONG, L. et al., "Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR Cas Systems", Science, (20130215), vol. 339, no. 6121, pages 819 - 23, XP055067741

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
    - MALI, P. et al., "RNA Guided Human Genome Engineering via Cas9", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, pages 823 - 826, XP055469277

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033
    - JINEK, M., "RNA-programmed genome editing in human cells", eLife 2013, (20130000), vol. 2, pages 1 - 9, XP055245475

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471
    - Psort data
    - BAIKER, "The Immediate-Early 63 Protein of Varicella-Zoster Virus; Analysis of Functional Domains Required for Replication In Vitro and for T- cell an Skin Tropism in the SCIDhu Model In Vivo", Journal of Viriology, (20040000), vol. 78, no. 3, pages 1181 - 1194, XP055268139

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.78.3.1181-1194.2004
    - PEREZ-PINERA, P. et al., "Advances in targeted genome editing", Current Opinion in Chemical Biology, (20120000), vol. 16, pages 267 - 277, XP055065262

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cbpa.2012.06.007
    - CARROLL, D., "Review Progress and prospects: Zinc-Finger nucleases as gene therapy agents", Gene therapy, (20080000), vol. 15, pages 1463 - 1468, XP055041104

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/gt.2008.145
    - HSU, P. S., "DNA targeting specificity of RNA-guided Cas9 nucleases", Nature Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, no. 9, pages 827 - 832, XP055382777

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2647
    - MAKAROVA et al., "Evolution and classification of the CRISPR-Cas systems", Nature Reviews Microbiology, (20110509), vol. 9, pages 467 - 477, XP055502950

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrmicro2577
    - GASIUNAS, G., "Cas9- crRNA ribonucleoprotein complex mediates specific DNA cleavage for adaptive immunity in bacteria", proc. nat. acad. sci., (20120000), vol. 109, no. 39, pages E2579 - E2586, XP055068588

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1208507109
    - RICHTER, C., "Function and Regulation of Clustered Regularly Interspaced Short Palindromic Repeats (CRISPR) / CRISPR Associated (Cas) Systems", Viruses, (20120000), vol. 4, pages 2291 - 2311, XP055299758

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/v4102291
    - MEI, YUE et al., "Recent Progress in CRISPR/Cas9 Technology", Genomics, (20160000), vol. 43, pages 63 - 72, XP029434259

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jgg.2016.01.001
    - CHO, S. W., "Targeted genome engineering in human cells with the Cas9 RNA-guided endonuclease (includes Supplementary information)", Nature Biotech., (20130000), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 230 - 232, 1-11, XP002699850

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2507
    - ISHINO Y et al., "Nucleotide sequence of the iap gene , responsible for alkaline phosphatase isozyme conversion in Escherichia coli, and identification of the gene product", Journal of Bacteriology, (19870000), vol. 169, no. 12, pages 5429 - 5433, XP055463130

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/jb.169.12.5429-5433.1987
    - MOJICA, F.J. et al., "Intervening sequences of regularly spaced prokaryotic repeats derive from foreign genetic elements .", J. Mol. Evol., (20050000), vol. 60, pages 174 - 182, XP019363173

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00239-004-0046-3
    - BOLOTIN, A. et al., "Clustered regularly interspaced short palindrome repeats (CRISPRs) have spacers of extrachromosomal origin", Microbiology, (20050000), vol. 151, pages 2551 - 2561, XP002424872

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/mic.0.28048-0
    - POURCEL, C. et al., "CRISPR elements in Yersinia pestis acquire new repeats by preferential uptake of bacteriophage DNA, and provide additional tools for evolutionary studies", Microbiology, (20050000), vol. 151, pages 653 - 663, XP002460396

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/mic.0.27437-0
    - BARRANGOU, R. et al., "CRISPR provides acquired resistance against viruses in prokaryotes", Science, (20070000), vol. 315, pages 1709 - 1712, XP002428071

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1138140
    - BROUNS, S. J. J. et al., "Small CRISPR RNAs Guide Antiviral Defense in Prokaryotes", Science, (20080000), vol. 321, pages 960 - 964, XP002559962

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1159689
    - MARRAFFINI, L.A. et al., "CRISPR interference limits horizontal gene transfer in Staphylococci by targeting DNA", NIH Public Access Author Manuscript, (20080000), vol. 322, pages 1 - 7, XP055463182

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1165771
    - MAKAROVA, K.S. et al., "An Updated Evolutionary Classification of CRISPR-Cas Systems", Nature, (20150000), vol. 13, pages 722 - 736, XP055271841

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrmicro3569
    - ZOLKIEWSKA A., "ADAM Proteases: Ligand Processing and Modulation of the Notch Pathway", NIH Public Access Author Manuscript, (20080000), vol. 65, no. 13, pages 1 - 19, XP055502966

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00018-008-7586-4
    - CARROLL, D., "A CRISPR Approach to Gene Targeting", Molecular Therapy, (20120000), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 1658 - 1660, XP055106489

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2012.171
    - BARRANGOU, R., "RNA-mediated programmable DNA cleavage", Nat. Biotechnology, (20120000), vol. 30, no. 9, pages 836 - 838, XP055118675

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2357
    - NISHIMASU et al., "Crystal structure of Cas9 in complex with Guide RNA and Target DNA", Cell, (20140000), vol. 156, no. 5, pages 935 - 949, XP028622533

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2014.02.001
    - FONFARA et al., "Phylogeny of Cas9 determines functional exchangeability of dual-RNA and Cas9 among orthologous type II CRISPR-cas systems", Nucleic Acids Research, (20140000), vol. 42, no. 4, pages 2577 - 2590, XP055399937

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkt1074
    - WATSON, J.D. et al., "12 Transferring Genes into Mammalian Cells", Recombinant DNA Second edition, (19920000), pages 213 - 234, XP055502977
    - CHANG, N. et al., "Genome editing with RNA-guided Cas9 nuclease in zebrafish embryos", Cell Res., (20130400), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 465 - 472, XP055251146

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.45
    - WANG et al., "One-Step Generation of Mice Carrying Mutations in Multiple Genes by CRISPR/Cas-Mediated Genome Engineering", Cell, (20130000), vol. 153, pages 910 - 918, XP028538358

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.04.025
    - GRATZ et al., "Genome Engineering of Drosophila with the CRISPR RNA-Guided Cas9 Nuclease", Genetics, (20130000), vol. 194, pages 1029 - 1035, XP055102690

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.152710
    - LI, J.F. et al., "Multiplex and homologous recombination-mediated genome editing in Arabidopsis and Nicotiana benthamiana using guide RNA and Cas9", nature biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, no. 8, pages 688 - 691, XP055129103

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2654
    - Li et al., "Multiplex and homologous recombination-mediated genome editing in Arabidopsis and Nicotiana benthamiana using guide RNA and Cas9 - Supplementary Information", Nature Biotechnology, vol. 31, no. 8, (20130801), pages 1 - 15, XP055337097

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2654
    - Mali et al., "RNA Guided Human Genome Engineering via Cas9", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, pages 823 - 826, XP055469277 * , plus Supplementary Materials *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033
    - Mali et al., "Supplementary Materials for RNA-Guided Human Genome Engineering via Cas9", Science, (20130215), vol. 339, pages 1 - 36, XP002723674

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033
    - CONG et al., "Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, pages 819 - 823, XP055067741 * , plus Supplementary Materials *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
    - Cong et al., "Supplementary Material to : Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", Science, vol. 339, pages 1 - 28, XP002730884

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
    - DICARLO et al., "Genome engineering in Saccharomyces cerevisiae using CRISPR-Cas systems", Nucleic Acids Research, (20130000), vol. 41, no. 7, pages 4336 - 4343, XP055086617 * and Supplemental Data *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkt135
    - DiCarlo et al., "Supplemental Data to Genome engineering in Saccharomyces cerevisiae using CRISPR-Cas systems", (20130401), vol. 41, no. 7, pages 1 - 5, XP055604254

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkt135
    - CHANG et al., "Genome editing with RNA-guided Cas9 nuclease in Zebrafish embryos", Cell Research, (20130000), vol. 23, pages 465 - 472, XP055251146 * plus Supplementary Information *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.45
    - Chang et al., "Supplementary Information ( tables S1-S6) to Genome editing with RNA-guided Cas9 nuclease in Zebrafish embryos", Cell Research, (20130401), page 10pp, XP055604261

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.45
    - LI et al., "Multiplex and homologous recombination-mediated genome editing in Arabidopsis and Nicotiana benthamiana using guide RNA and Cas9", NIH Public Access Author Manuscript, (20130000), vol. 31, no. 8, pages 1 - 8, XP055438438

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2654
    - BROUNS, "A Swiss Army Knife of Immunity", Science, (20120000), vol. 337, pages 808 - 809, XP055113718 * , plus Supplementary Materials *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1227253
    - CHRISTIAN et al., "Targeting DNA Double-Strand Breaks with TAL Effector Nucleases (plus supporting information)", Genetics, (20100000), vol. 186, no. 2, pages 757 - 761+1SI-(SI, XP002632806

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/GENETICS.110.120717
    - MILLER et al., "A TALE nuclease architecture for efficient genome editing (includes Online Methods)", Nature Biotechnology, (20110000), vol. 29, pages 143 - 148+2pp, XP002685898 * plus Online Methods *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1755
    - URNOV et al., "Genome editing with engineered zinc finger nucleases", Nature Reviews Genetics, (20100000), vol. 11, no. 9, pages 636 - 646, XP055198280

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg2842
    - CARROLL, "Progress and prospects: Zinc-finger nucleases as gene therapy agents", Gene Therapy, (20080000), vol. 15, no. 12, pages 1463 - 1468, XP055041104

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/gt.2008.145
    - JOUNG et al., "TALENs: a widely applicable technology for targeted genome editing", Nature Reviews Molecular Cell Biology, (20130000), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 49 - 55, XP055282847

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrm3486
    - "Genome editing", Wikipedia, (20120906), page 7pp, Wikipedia, URL: https://en.wikipedia/wfinder.php?title=Genome_editing&oldid=511115185, XP055604306
    - cNLS mapper report for S. pyogenes Cas9
    - CERMAK et al., "Efficient design and assembly of custom TALEN and other TAL effector-based constructs for DNA targeting", Nucleic Acids Research, (20110000), vol. 39, no. 12, pages 1 - 11, XP055130093

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkr218
    - LI et al., "Modularly assembled designer TAL effector nucleases for targeted gene knockout and gene replacement in eukaryotes", Nucleic Acids Research, (20110000), vol. 39, no. 14, pages 6315 - 6325, XP002680499

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/NAR/GKR188
    - REBAR et al., "Induction of angiogenesis in a mouse model using engineered transcription factors", Nature Medicine, (20020000), vol. 8, no. 12, pages 1427 - 1432, XP002993087

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm795
    - LEWIN et al., "Nuclear localization sequences target proteins to the nucleus", Cells, (20070000), page 224, XP055254866
    - KOURANOVA et al., "CRISPRs for Optimal Targeting: Delivery of CRISPR Components as DNA, RNA, and Protein into Cultured Cells and Single-Cell Embryos", Human Gene Therapy, (20160000), vol. 27, no. 6, pages 464 - 475, XP055465083

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hum.2016.009
    - LE PROVOST et al., "Zinc finger nuclease technology heralds a new era in mammalian transgenesis", Trends in Biotechnology, (20090000), vol. 28, no. 3, pages 134 - 141, XP026906787

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2009.11.007
    - GANTZ et al., "Targeted Genomic Integration of a Selectable Floxed Dual Fluorescence Reporter in Human Embryonic Stem Cells", PLOS One, (20120000), vol. 7, no. 10, pages 1 - 9, XP055514936

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0046971
    - HOCKEMEYER et al., "Gene Targeting in Human Pluripotent Cells", Cold Spring Harb Symp Quant Biol, (20100000), pages 201 - 209, URL: http://symposium.cshlp.org/content/75/201.full.pdf, (20180620), XP055604347 * );75:201-209 *
    - CRISTEA et al., "In vivo cleavage of transgene donors promotes nuclease-mediated targeted integration", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (20130000), vol. 110, no. 3, pages 871 - 880, XP055076901

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.24733