Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3131010

EP3131010 - METHOD OF MANAGING APPLICATION AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.06.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.04.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2017/07]
Inventor(s)01 / PARK, Hyun-Woo
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
02 / SON, Dae-Yong
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
03 / SONG, Jae-Woong
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
04 / SONG, Chang-Ryeol
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
05 / JUN, Woo-Jin
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
 [2017/07]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/07]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date16183832.111.08.2016
[2017/07]
Priority number, dateKR2015011413212.08.2015         Original published format: KR 20150114132
[2017/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3131010
Date:15.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/50
[2017/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/22]
Former [2017/07]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG EINER ANWENDUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2017/07]
English:METHOD OF MANAGING APPLICATION AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE THEREFOR[2017/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'APPLICATION ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE CORRESPONDANT[2017/07]
Examination procedure11.08.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/22]
14.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - Stephen Rhee, "What's New in Core Location", (20141231), pages 11 - 257, URL: http://devstreaming.apple.com/videos/wwdc/2014/706xxjytntg51wd/706/706_whats_new_in_core_location.pdf, (20161209), XP055327912 [X] 1,5,6,9-11,14,15 * pages 12,31-36 * * pages 45,49,52 * * pages 57,62,68 * * pages 108,191 * * page 1 * [I] 2-4,7,8,12,13
 [X]  - Anonymous, "iOS 7: Understanding Location Services - Apple Support", (20141120), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20141120191820/http://support.apple.com/en-us/HT201357, (20161209), XP055327743 [X] 1,10,11 * page 1 - page 2 *