EP3130591 - CONDENSED CYCLIC COMPOUND AND ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 150-20, Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2019/41] |
Former [2017/07] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | ||
For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 150-20, Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUNG, Yeonsook c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
KIM, Sangmo c/o SAMSUNG FINE CHEMICALS CO., LTD 19 Yeocheon-ro 217beon-gil Nam-gu 44714 Ulsan / KR | 03 /
KIM, Hyunjung c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
JEON, Soonok c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
JUNG, Yongsik c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
CHAE, Miyoung c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
HUH, Dalho c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 08 /
KANG, Hosuk c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 09 /
KIM, Jongsoo c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2017/07] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2019/41] |
Former [2017/07] | Scheuermann, Erik Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 16183873.5 | 11.08.2016 | [2017/07] | Priority number, date | KR20150114548 | 13.08.2015 Original published format: KR 20150114548 | [2017/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3130591 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3130591 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/14, C07D405/10, C07D417/10, C07D417/14, C07D491/04, C07D493/04, C07D495/04, C09K11/06, H01L51/50 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (CN);
H10K85/6572 (US);
C07D405/10 (EP,CN,US);
C07D409/10 (EP,CN,US);
C07D409/12 (CN);
C07D417/10 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,US);
C07D491/04 (EP,US);
C07D491/048 (EP,CN,US);
C07D493/04 (EP,CN,US);
C07D495/04 (EP,CN,US);
C09K11/025 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,CN,US);
H10K50/11 (CN,US);
H10K85/322 (US);
H10K85/342 (US);
H10K85/361 (US);
H10K85/654 (US);
H10K85/657 (CN,US);
H10K85/6574 (CN,US);
H10K85/6576 (CN,US);
C09K2211/1007 (US);
C09K2211/1022 (US);
C09K2211/1044 (US);
C09K2211/1088 (CN);
C09K2211/1092 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] |
Former [2017/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KONDENSIERTE CYCLISCHE VERBINDUNG UND ORGANISCHE LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2017/07] | English: | CONDENSED CYCLIC COMPOUND AND ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME | [2017/07] | French: | COMPOSÉ CYCLIQUE CONDENSÉ ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE COMPRENANT CELUI-CI | [2017/07] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 25.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.08.2016 | AL | 09.10.2019 | AT | 09.10.2019 | CY | 09.10.2019 | CZ | 09.10.2019 | DK | 09.10.2019 | EE | 09.10.2019 | ES | 09.10.2019 | FI | 09.10.2019 | HR | 09.10.2019 | IT | 09.10.2019 | LT | 09.10.2019 | LV | 09.10.2019 | MC | 09.10.2019 | MK | 09.10.2019 | MT | 09.10.2019 | NL | 09.10.2019 | PL | 09.10.2019 | RO | 09.10.2019 | RS | 09.10.2019 | SE | 09.10.2019 | SI | 09.10.2019 | SK | 09.10.2019 | SM | 09.10.2019 | TR | 09.10.2019 | BG | 09.01.2020 | NO | 09.01.2020 | GR | 10.01.2020 | IS | 09.02.2020 | PT | 10.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 11.08.2016 | |
AL | 09.10.2019 | ||
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
MT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
TR | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 09.10.2019 | |
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 09.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2878599 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 3, line 8 - page 3, line 19; compounds 31-45,76-90,107-109 *; | [AP]EP2966146 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [AP] 1-15* page 2, line 10 - page 2, line 19; compound 39 * | Examination | WO2014208698 |