Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3130591

EP3130591 - CONDENSED CYCLIC COMPOUND AND ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.08.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
For all designated states
Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
150-20, Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
[2019/41]
Former [2017/07]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
For all designated states
Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
150-20, Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / CHUNG, Yeonsook
c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology
130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / KIM, Sangmo
c/o SAMSUNG FINE CHEMICALS CO., LTD
19
Yeocheon-ro 217beon-gil
Nam-gu
44714 Ulsan / KR
03 / KIM, Hyunjung
c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology
130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / JEON, Soonok
c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology
130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR
05 / JUNG, Yongsik
c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology
130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR
06 / CHAE, Miyoung
c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology
130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR
07 / HUH, Dalho
c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology
130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR
08 / KANG, Hosuk
c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology
130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR
09 / KIM, Jongsoo
c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology
130, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2017/07]
Representative(s)Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[2019/41]
Former [2017/07]Scheuermann, Erik
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date16183873.511.08.2016
[2017/07]
Priority number, dateKR2015011454813.08.2015         Original published format: KR 20150114548
[2017/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3130591
Date:15.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3130591
Date:09.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:C07D405/14, C07D405/10, C07D417/10, C07D417/14, C07D491/04, C07D493/04, C07D495/04, C09K11/06, H01L51/50
[2017/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/39]
Former [2017/07]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:KONDENSIERTE CYCLISCHE VERBINDUNG UND ORGANISCHE LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT[2017/07]
English:CONDENSED CYCLIC COMPOUND AND ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME[2017/07]
French:COMPOSÉ CYCLIQUE CONDENSÉ ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE COMPRENANT CELUI-CI[2017/07]
Examination procedure11.08.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.08.2017Examination requested  [2017/39]
25.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.08.2019Fee for grant paid
05.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
02.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[I]EP2878599  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 3, line 8 - page 3, line 19; compounds 31-45,76-90,107-109 *;
 [AP]EP2966146  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [AP] 1-15 * page 2, line 10 - page 2, line 19; compound 39 *
ExaminationWO2014208698