Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3135446

EP3135446 - ROBOTIC GRIPPER MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.08.2017
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[N/P]
Former [2017/09]For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn PA 19312 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Malstrom, Charles Randall
1006 Kiner Avenue
Lebanon, PA Pennsylvania 17042 / US
02 / Solanki, Swapnilsinh
225 Francis L Cadden Parkway
Harrisburg, PA Pennsylvania 17111 / US
 [2017/09]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2017/09]
Application number, filing date16185068.022.08.2016
[2017/09]
Priority number, dateUS20151483906228.08.2015         Original published format: US201514839062
[2017/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3135446
Date:01.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:B25J19/06
[2017/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/39]
Former [2017/09]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROBOTERGREIFERMECHANISMUS[2017/09]
English:ROBOTIC GRIPPER MECHANISM[2017/09]
French:MÉCANISME DE PRÉHENSION ROBOTIQUE[2017/09]
Examination procedure22.08.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.08.2017Examination requested  [2017/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]JP2011056595  (KDE CORP) [X] 1,5-7 * abstract * [Y] 2-4,8-12;
 [Y]US2006181092  (KIKUT BOTHO [DE], et al) [Y] 2-4,11,12 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0037] *;
 [Y]JP2007222971  (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 8-10 * figures 36-40 * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0066] *;
 [A]JPS6029489U  (SANKYO) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]JPS61226233  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-12 * abstract *