Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3136292

EP3136292 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CLASSIFYING AN OBJECT OF AN IMAGE AND CORRESPONDING COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.09.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2017/09]
Inventor(s)01 / BURGOS, Xavier
Carrer del Consell de Cent, 358, 3° 1a
08009 BARCELONE / ES
02 / KABBAJ, Nezha
TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE
975 AVENUE DES CHAMPS BLANCS
35576 CESSON SEVIGNE CEDEX / FR
03 / LE CLERC, François
TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE
975 AVENUE DES CHAMPS BLANCS
35576 CESSON SEVIGNE CEDEX / FR
 [2017/09]
Representative(s)Vidon Brevets & Stratégie
16B, rue de Jouanet
BP 90333
35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/09]Huchet, Anne
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Application number, filing date16185451.824.08.2016
[2017/09]
Priority number, dateEP2015030632928.08.2015         Original published format: EP 15306329
[2017/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3136292
Date:01.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00
[2017/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/41]
Former [2017/09]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KLASSIFIZIEREN EINES OBJEKTS EINES BILDES UND ZUGEHÖRIGES COMPUTERPROGRAMM-PRODUKT UND COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM[2017/09]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CLASSIFYING AN OBJECT OF AN IMAGE AND CORRESPONDING COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM[2017/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CLASSIFICATION D'UN OBJET D'UNE IMAGE, PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE CORRESPONDANT ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR[2017/09]
Examination procedure24.08.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.09.2017Examination requested  [2017/41]
02.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2014147022  (ZHOU FENG [US], et al) [X] 1,8,15 * paragraphs [0028] , [0035] - [0037] - [0051] - [0054] - [0063] * [I] 2-7,9-14;
 [XI]US2014044359  (ROUSSON MICHEAL [US]) [X] 1,8,15 * paragraphs [0026] , [0035] - [0036]; figures 1,2,7 * [I] 2-7,9-14;
 [A]US2013022277  (MORISHITA YUSUKE [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0028] - [0034] - [0037] - [0039] *;
 [A]US2009220157  (KATO MASAMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0088] - [0096]; figure 15 *
by applicant   - P. DOLLAR ET AL., "Cascaded Pose Regression", IEEE COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, (2010), pages 1078 - 1085, XP031725923
    - V. VAPNIK ET AL., "Support vector method for function approximation, regression estimation, and signal processing", ADVANCES IN NEURAL INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEMS, (1996), vol. 9
    - P. VIOLA ET AL., "Robust Real-time Face detection", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, (2004), vol. 57, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1023/B:VISI.0000013087.49260.fb, pages 137 - 154, XP008035702

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:VISI.0000013087.49260.fb