Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3160183

EP3160183 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OFFLOADING BACKHAUL TRAFFIC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.03.2019  [2019/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Interdigital Patent Holdings, Inc.
200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300
Wilmington, DE 19809 / US
[2017/17]
Inventor(s)01 / RATH, Ayaskant
250 Holger Way
San Jose, California 95134 / US
02 / REZNIK, Alexander
416 South Main Street
Pennington, New Jersey 08534 / US
03 / PRAGADA, Ravikumar V.
309 Johnson Road
Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US
04 / TOMICI, John L.
1530 Wells Avenue
Southold, New York 11971 / US
05 / CHITRAPU, Prabhakar R.
135 Brochant Drive
Blue Bell, Pennsylvania 19422 / US
06 / CUFFARO, Angelo A.
3837 Place du Brigadier
Laval, Quebec H7E 5M7 / CA
07 / KIERNAN, Brian G.
435 Carpenter's Cove
Downingtown, Pennsylvania 19335 / US
08 / MURRAY, Joseph M.
12 Ashley Drive
Schwenksville, Pennsylvania 19473 / US
 [2017/17]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2017/17]Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date16187798.015.03.2013
[2017/17]
Priority number, dateUS201261614325P22.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261614325 P
US201361764758P14.02.2013         Original published format: US 201361764758 P
[2017/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3160183
Date:26.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/08, H04W28/02
[2017/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTLASTUNG EINES BACKHAUL-VERKEHRS[2017/17]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OFFLOADING BACKHAUL TRAFFIC[2017/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉCHARGEMENT DE LA CIRCULATION DE LIAISON[2017/17]
Examination procedure08.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/17]
08.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/10]
30.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/10]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13714430.9  / EP2829110
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[IY]US8103310  (SRINIVAS SHILPA KOWDLEY [US], et al) [I] 1,2,6-11,15-18 * figure 1A * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 9 * * column 4, lines 3-9,14-31,31-49 * * column 5, lines 28-44 * * column 9, lines 1-11 * * column 10, lines 52-56 * * column 10, line 65 - column 11, line 23 * * column 11, lines 24-36,37-50,51-63 * * column 11, line 64 - column 12, line 9 * [Y] 3-5,12-14;
 [Y]US2010316096  (ADJAKPLE PASCAL M [US], et al) [Y] 3,12 * paragraphs [0039] , [0049] , [0059] *;
 [Y]WO2011116240  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [Y] 4,5,13,14 * paragraphs [0068] , [0077] - [0080] - [0090] *;
 [A]WO2011088901  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 3, lines 15-18 * * page 4, lines 8-14 * * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 3 *