Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3141643

EP3141643 - TERRY ARTICLE WITH SYNTHETIC FILAMENT YARNS AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.08.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.10.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Welspun India Limited
Welspun House
7th Floor
Kamala City
Senapati Bapat Marg, Lower Parel
Mumbai 400013 / IN
[2017/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Goenka, Dipali
Welspun House
7th Floor, Kamala City
Senapati Bapat Marg
Lower Parel
400013 Mumbai / IN
 [2017/11]
Representative(s)Avidity IP
Broers Building
Hauser Forum
21 JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/11]Chapman, Alan Gareth , et al
Avidity IP
Broers Building
Hauser Forum
21 JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB
Application number, filing date16188260.012.09.2016
[2017/11]
Priority number, dateIN2015MUM347410.09.2015         Original published format: IN 3474MU2015
US20151486691626.09.2015         Original published format: US201514866916
[2017/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3141643
Date:15.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3141643
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2017
ClassificationInternational:D03D27/08, D03D15/04
[2017/13]
Former International [2017/11]D03D27/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/45]
Former [2017/11]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLFADENARTIKEL MIT SYNTHETISCHEN GARNEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2017/11]
English:TERRY ARTICLE WITH SYNTHETIC FILAMENT YARNS AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME[2017/11]
French:ARTICLE EN TISSU EPONGE COMPRENANT DES FILS CONTINUS SYNTHETIQUES ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2017/11]
Examination procedure12.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.09.2017Examination requested  [2017/45]
09.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US3030691  (LAW MARVIN A) [X] 1-10,14,15,18,19 * column 4, line 5 - column 7, line 28; figures 1-5,10,11 *;
 [X]EP2534987  (TRICOL JAPAN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10,12-15,19 * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 29 * * column 6, line 7 - column 6, line 16 * * column 7, line 22 - column 8, line 24; figures 1,2 *