Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3292943

EP3292943 - LEAD-FREE SOLDER ALLOY COMPRISING SN, BI AND AT LEAST ONE OF P, MN, CU, ZN, SB AND ITS USE FOR SOLDERING AN ELECTRONIC COMPONENT TO A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.09.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Interflux Electronics N.V.
Eddastraat 51
9042 Gent / BE
[2018/11]
Inventor(s)01 / WERKHOVEN, Daniel
Eddastraat 51
9042 Gent / BE
02 / PEETERS, Annick
Eddastraat 51
9042 Gent / BE
03 / LAUWAERT, Ralph
Eddastraat 51
9042 Gent / BE
04 / MARIS, Isabelle
Eddastraat 51
9042 Gent / BE
05 / VAN DE LISDONK, Bart
Eddastraat 51
9042 Gent / BE
06 / TELISZEWSKI, Steven
Eddastraat 51
9042 Gent / BE
 [2018/11]
Representative(s)Nollen, Maarten Dirk-Johan
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[2018/11]
Application number, filing date16188368.112.09.2016
[2018/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3292943
Date:14.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:B23K35/26, H05K3/34, C22C13/02, B23K35/362
[2018/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/43]
Former [2018/11]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BLEIFREIE LOTLEGIERUNG AUFWEISEND SN, BI UND ZUMINDEST EIN VON P, MN, CU, ZN, SB UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUM LÖTEN EINES ELEKTRONISCHEN BAUTEILS AUF EIN SUBSTRAT[2018/11]
English:LEAD-FREE SOLDER ALLOY COMPRISING SN, BI AND AT LEAST ONE OF P, MN, CU, ZN, SB AND ITS USE FOR SOLDERING AN ELECTRONIC COMPONENT TO A SUBSTRATE[2018/11]
French:ALLIAGE DE SOUDURE SANS PLOMB COMPRENANT SN, BI ET AU MOINS UN PARMI P, MN, CU, ZN, SB ET SON UTILISATION POUR SOUDER UN COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE À UN SUBSTRAT[2018/11]
Examination procedure12.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.09.2018Examination requested  [2018/43]
19.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]JP2000141079  (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0049] * * figure 7 * [Y] 7-10;
 [XY]JP2001179483  (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [X] 1-4,6 * the whole document * [Y] 7-10;
 [XY]CN104416297  (SUZHOU EUNOW ELECTRONIC MATERIAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6 * the whole document * [Y] 7-10;
 [XY]CN104416298  (SUZHOU EUNOW ELECTRONIC MATERIAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6 * the whole document * [Y] 7-10;
 [XDY]EP2987876  (SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO [JP]) [XD] 1-3,6 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0053] * * table 1, entries "Comparison example 2", "Comparison example 7", "Comparison example 9" * * figures 6-8 * [Y] 7-10;
 [XY]EP3031566  (SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,6 * the whole document * [Y] 1,2,6-10;
 [Y]CN1927525  (BEIJING NONFERROUS METAL [CN]) [Y] 1,2,6-10 * section "The background art" * * section "The disclosure of the invention", sixth paragraph * * table 4 *;
 [X]  - WANG X-J ET AL, "Effect of P on Microstructure and Mechanical Properties of Sn-Bi Solder", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS ENGINEERING, (20160719), vol. 44, no. 7, doi:10.11868/j.issn.1001-4381.2016.07.019, pages 113 - 118, XP055348987 [X] 1-4,6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.11868/j.issn.1001-4381.2016.07.019
 [XD]  - FELTON L E ET AL, "The Properties of Tin-Bismuth Alloy Solders", JOM: JOURNAL OF METALS, SPRINGER NEW YORK LLC, UNITED STATES, (199307), vol. 45, no. 7, ISSN 1047-4838, pages 28 - 32, XP000383231 [XD] 1,6 * the whole document *
 [XY]  - KIM J-H ET AL, "Ductility Enhancement in Sn-40Bi-X Alloys by Minor Additions of Alloying Elements", KOREAN JOURNAL OF METALS AND MATERIALS, (20110325), vol. 49, no. 3, doi:10.3365/KJMM.2011.49.3.211, ISSN 1738-8228, pages 211 - 220, XP055376909 [X] 1-3,6 * the whole document * [Y] 1,2,6-10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3365/KJMM.2011.49.3.211
 [Y]  - -, "Solder pastes", (20160626), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20160626015928/http://www.interflux.com/en/solder-pastes, (20170227), XP055349629 [Y] 7-10 * Entry "DP 5600" *
 [A]  - "Organic solderability preservative", Wikipedia, (20151017), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Organic_solderability_preservative&oldid=686204285, (20170227), XP055349623 [A] 1-4,6-10 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0629467
 JP2013000744
 EP2987876
    - FELTON ET AL., "The properties of tin-bismuth alloy solders", JOURNAL OF MINERALS, METALS & MATERIALS SOCIETY (JOM), (1993), vol. 45, pages 28 - 32