EP3131218 - METHOD FOR MEASURING CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION IN A WIRELESS ACCESS SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2017/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEO, Hanbyul LG Institute, 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong, Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hakseong LG Institute, 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong, Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | [2017/07] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/07] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16188520.7 | 17.12.2012 | [2017/07] | Priority number, date | US201161576356P | 16.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161576356 P | [2017/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3131218 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3131218 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04J11/00, H04B7/26, H04L1/00, H04W24/08, H04W72/04, H04W88/02 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
H04J11/0056 (EP,US);
H04B7/0626 (KR);
H04W24/08 (KR,US);
H04B17/345 (KR);
H04J11/00 (EP,US);
H04J11/0023 (US);
H04L1/0013 (KR);
H04L1/0026 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (KR);
H04W24/10 (KR);
H04W72/04 (KR);
H04W72/23 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/07] | H04J11/00, H04B7/26, H04L1/00, H04W24/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] |
Former [2017/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG VON KANALSTATUSINFORMATIONEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSZUGANGSSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2017/07] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION IN A WIRELESS ACCESS SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR SAME | [2017/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR MESURER DES INFORMATIONS D'ÉTAT DE CANAL DANS UN SYSTÈME D'ACCÈS SANS FIL ET APPAREIL CORRESPONDANT | [2017/07] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 13.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12856809.4 / EP2793414 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2012 | AL | 19.06.2019 | AT | 19.06.2019 | CY | 19.06.2019 | CZ | 19.06.2019 | DK | 19.06.2019 | EE | 19.06.2019 | ES | 19.06.2019 | HR | 19.06.2019 | IT | 19.06.2019 | LT | 19.06.2019 | LV | 19.06.2019 | MC | 19.06.2019 | MK | 19.06.2019 | MT | 19.06.2019 | NL | 19.06.2019 | PL | 19.06.2019 | RO | 19.06.2019 | RS | 19.06.2019 | SI | 19.06.2019 | SK | 19.06.2019 | SM | 19.06.2019 | TR | 19.06.2019 | BG | 19.09.2019 | NO | 19.09.2019 | GR | 20.09.2019 | IS | 19.10.2019 | PT | 21.10.2019 | IE | 17.12.2019 | LU | 17.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 17.12.2012 | |
AL | 19.06.2019 | ||
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
MT | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IE | 17.12.2019 | ||
LU | 17.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 17.12.2012 | |
AL | 19.06.2019 | ||
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IE | 17.12.2019 | ||
LU | 17.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IE | 17.12.2019 | ||
LU | 17.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IE | 17.12.2019 | ||
LU | 17.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IE | 17.12.2019 | ||
LU | 17.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 19.06.2019 | |
NO | 19.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2009052754 (MEDIATEK INC [CN], et al); | [Y]KR20110122046 (PANTECH CO LTD [KR]); | [XPI]WO2012167431 (RENESAS MOBILE CORP [JP], et al); | US2013051356 [ ] (HONG SUNG KWON [KR], et al); | [E]WO2013100581 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |