Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3189885

EP3189885 - PROCESS CONTROL FOR AN IMMERSED MEMBRANE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.01.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.07.2018  [2018/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zenon Technology Partnership
The Corporation Trust Company Corporation Trust Centre, 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US
[2017/28]
Inventor(s)01 / GINZBURG, Boris Fernandez
3239 Dundas Street West
Oakville, Ontario L6M 4B2 / CA
02 / YACOUB, Francois
2035 Bloomfield Drive
Oakville, Ontario L6M 3W2 / CA
03 / COTE, Pierre Lucien
26 Tally-ho Drive
Dundas, Ontario L9H 3M6 / CA
04 / JANSON, Arnold
343 Rankin Drive
Burlington, Ontario L7N 2B2 / CA
 [2017/28]
Representative(s)Fonquernie, Sophie Benedicte , et al
Marks & Clerk France
Immeuble Visium
22, avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/28]Foster, Christopher Michael
General Electric Technology GmbH
GE Corporate Intellectual Property
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
Application number, filing date16188570.211.07.2006
[2017/28]
Priority number, dateUS20050697953P12.07.2005         Original published format: US 697953 P
US20050697974P12.07.2005         Original published format: US 697974 P
US20050751979P21.12.2005         Original published format: US 751979 P
[2017/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3189885
Date:12.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:B01D61/18, B01D61/22, B01D65/02, B01D65/08, C02F1/44, C02F3/12
[2017/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/08]
Former [2017/28]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:PROZESSSTEUERUNG FÜR EIN TAUCHMEMBRANSYSTEM[2017/28]
English:PROCESS CONTROL FOR AN IMMERSED MEMBRANE SYSTEM[2017/28]
French:CONTRÔLE DE PROCÉDÉ POUR UN SYSTÈME DE MEMBRANE IMMERGÉ[2017/28]
Examination procedure13.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/08]
13.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/28]
20.02.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2018/28]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06752903.2  / EP1904216
EP11152729.7  / EP2314368
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
13.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
13.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
13.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
13.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
13.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
13.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
13.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[XI]JPH1119680  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-3 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0042] * [I] 4-9;
 [XI]US6616843  (BEHMANN HENRY [CA], et al) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 * * claim 1 * [I] 4-9;
 [I]JP2005144291  (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [I] 1-9 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0017]; figure 1 *;
 [I]JPH0975938  (KURITA WATER IND LTD) [I] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [XDI]WO2005039742  (ZENON ENVIRONMENTAL INC [CA], et al) [XD] 1,3 * figure 10 * * paragraph [0042] * [I] 2,4-9