Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3147435

EP3147435 - PULL-OUT LOCKING DEVICE AND PIECE OF FURNITURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.07.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Change - classificationpublished on 14.08.2019 [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Martin Lehmann GmbH & Co. KG
Am Kohlgraben 6-10
32429 Minden / DE
[2017/13]
Inventor(s)01 / The inventor has agreed to waive his entitlement to designation.
02 / The inventor has agreed to waive his entitlement to designation.
03 / The inventor has agreed to waive his entitlement to designation.
 [2017/13]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/13]
Application number, filing date16188605.613.09.2016
[2017/13]
Priority number, dateDE201520105093U28.09.2015         Original published format: DE 202015105093 U
[2017/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3147435
Date:29.03.2017
Language:DE
[2017/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.2017
ClassificationInternational:E05B65/464, // E05B65/463
[2017/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/31]
Former [2017/13]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUSZIEHSPERRVORRICHTUNG UND MÖBEL[2017/13]
English:PULL-OUT LOCKING DEVICE AND PIECE OF FURNITURE[2017/13]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ARRET D'EXTRACTION ET MEUBLE[2017/13]
Examination procedure13.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/31]
21.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0628685  (MILLER HERMAN INC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,11,12,15 * column 4, line 11 - column 5, line 55; figures 1-8 * * column 7, line 8 - line 42 * [I] 2,5-7,13,14;
 [XAI]DE3431386  (ANTON KESSEL FA [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,9,11,12 * page 8, line 5 - page 10, line 35; figures 1-6 * [A] 10 [I] 4;
 [I]US5931548  (BISCHOFF DANIEL RALPH [US]) [I] 1,5,8,11,12,14 * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 15; figures 1, 2, 15-18 * * column 9, line 13 - column 11, line 4 *;
 [A]DE20108310U  (HUWIL WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7,11,12,14,15 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 * * page 9 *
by applicantDE10206854
 DE202010008029U