Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3139569

EP3139569 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.08.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Skype
70 Sir John Rogerson's Quay
Dublin 2 / IE
[2017/10]
Inventor(s)01 / MADANES, Rodrigo
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
02 / SOPIEVA, Natasha, Valerie
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
03 / NILSSON, Linus
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
04 / CORR, Nick
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
 [2018/05]
Former [2017/10]01 / MADANES, Rodrigo
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
02 / SOPIEVA, Natasha, Valerie
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
03 / NILSSON, Linus
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
04 / CORR, Nick
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
Representative(s)Townsend, Martyn
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2017/10]
Application number, filing date16189042.105.12.2007
[2017/10]
Priority number, dateGB2006002457708.12.2006         Original published format: GB 0624577
GB2007000327420.02.2007         Original published format: GB 0703274
[2017/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3139569
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3139569
Date:31.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L29/08
[2017/35]
Former International [2017/10]H04L29/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/10]
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2017/10]
English:COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2017/10]
French:SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION[2017/10]
Examination procedure15.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/10]
04.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2017Fee for grant paid
04.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07872059.6  / EP2100426
Opposition(s)02.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
15.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
15.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
15.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
15.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
15.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
15.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/13]AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/36]ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
Former [2018/35]FI31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US2004057415  (COLSON VICKI L [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0015] - [0020]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0023] - [0036]; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]US2006239279  (CLASSEN ANDRE R [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0008] , [0035] - [0071]; figures 2-4 * * paragraphs [0087] - [0105]; figures 5-7 *;
 [A]US2005249196  (ANSARI AMIR [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0013] - [0017] * * paragraphs [0072] - [0101]; figures 6,7 * * paragraphs [0140] - [0240]; figures 12-16 *;
 [A]US2004128151  (MOCK VON ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] * * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0046]; figures 5-12 *
by applicantWO2005009019
 US20060416378