Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3296017

EP3296017 - CALIBRATED TRANSPARENT TUBE FOR FRACTIONATION IN PROVISION OF PLATELETS RICH PLASMA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2018/12]COLLECTION TUBE AND CALIBRATED TRANSPARENT TUBE FOR FRACTIONATION IN PROVISION OF PLATELETS RICH PLASMA
[2018/36]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vital Esthetique Sarl
34, rue des Cevennes
75015 Paris / FR
[2018/12]
Inventor(s)01 / YOUSSEF, Ahmed
P.O. Box 16789
35858 Qadisiyah / KW
 [2018/12]
Representative(s)Tahtadjiev, Konstantin
J.k. Goce Delchev bl.233, et. 8, ap. 35
1404 Sofia / BG
[N/P]
Former [2018/12]Ivanov, Ivan Nikolov
Mitropolit Kiril Vidinski Str.
No. 6-8, entr. 8, floor 2
1164 Sofia / BG
Application number, filing date16189473.819.09.2016
[2018/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3296017
Date:21.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:B01L3/00, A61B5/15
[2018/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/12]
Extension statesBA10.10.2016
ME10.10.2016
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KALIBRIERTES TRANSPARENTES ROHR ZUR FRAKTIONIERUNG BEI DER BEREITSTELLUNG VON PLÄTTCHENREICHEM PLASMA[2018/36]
English:CALIBRATED TRANSPARENT TUBE FOR FRACTIONATION IN PROVISION OF PLATELETS RICH PLASMA[2018/36]
French:TUBE TRANSPARENT ÉTALONNÉ POUR FRACTIONNEMENT EN PROVISION DE PLASMA RICHE SUR LAMELLES[2018/36]
Former [2018/12]SAMMELROHR UND KALIBRIERTES TRANSPARENTES ROHR ZUR FRAKTIONIERUNG BEI DER BEREITSTELLUNG VON PLÄTTCHENREICHEM PLASMA
Former [2018/12]COLLECTION TUBE AND CALIBRATED TRANSPARENT TUBE FOR FRACTIONATION IN PROVISION OF PLATELETS RICH PLASMA
Former [2018/12]TUBE COLLECTEUR ET TUBE TRANSPARENT ÉTALONNÉ POUR FRACTIONNEMENT EN PROVISION DE PLASMA RICHE SUR LAMELLES
Examination procedure19.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.06.2017Examination requested  [2018/12]
28.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/28]
22.02.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/28]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201803   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2009209933  (ZYLBERBERG JAVIER [US], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0001] *;
 [YA]CN201524083U  (TIANJIN BAILI KANGTAI BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0019]; figure 1 * [A] 4;
 [A]US2010168535  (ROBINSON MARK RIES [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0053] *;
 [A]US6077235  (SERPENTINO PETER [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 39-50 *;
 [A]WO2014165498  (ALLIANCE PARTNERS LLC [US]) [A] 2-4 * paragraphs [0019] - [0026]; figure 1 *;
 [A]KR101409443B  (KIM JUN WOO [KR]) [A] 2-4 * figure 7 *
by applicantUS2012251411