Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3231458

EP3231458 - LID FOR A CANISTER OF A MEDICAL WASTE FLUID COLLECTION AND DISPOSAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.07.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.04.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dornoch Medical Systems, Inc.
4032 W. Riverside Street
Riverside, Missouri 64168 / US
[2017/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Martini, Anthony J.
14821 Summertree
Olathe, KS 66062 / US
02 / Guerra, Lawrence
6219 West 65th Street
Mission
Kansas 66202 / US
 [2017/42]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2017/42]
Application number, filing date16189730.106.10.2008
[2017/42]
Priority number, dateUS20070997787P04.10.2007         Original published format: US 997787 P
[2017/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3231458
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/00, B08B9/08
[2017/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/22]
Former [2017/42]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:DECKEL EINES BEHÄLTERS FÜR EIN SYSTEM ZUM SAMMELN UND ENTSORGEN VON MEDIZINISCHEN ABFALLFLÜSSIGKEITEN[2017/42]
English:LID FOR A CANISTER OF A MEDICAL WASTE FLUID COLLECTION AND DISPOSAL SYSTEM[2017/42]
French:COUVERCLE DE BOITE POUR UN SYSTÈME DE COLLECTE DE FLUIDES DE DÉCHETS MÉDICAUX[2017/42]
Examination procedure20.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.01.2017Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
28.02.2017Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
18.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.04.2018Examination requested  [2018/22]
04.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08165948.4  / EP2044964
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
20.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
20.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
20.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
20.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
17.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XD]US7090663  (DUNN JAMES L [US], et al) [XD] 1-7,9-15 * column 7, line 8 - column 8, line 5; figures 5-8 *;
 [X]US2005139532  (HERSHBERGER DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1,8-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0040] - [0042] - [0 45]; figures 3, 4 *;
 [X]DE202006012253U  (PACIFIC HOSPITAL SUPPLY CO LTD [TW]) [X] 1,2,9-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0018]; figures 2-4 *;
 [X]US5792126  (TRIBASTONE DANIEL N [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8-11,14,15 * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 65; figures 1, 6, 7 *
by applicantUS7090663