Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3296467 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3296467



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 960
17.05.2024 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 13
17.05.2024 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.05.2024 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
08.05.2024 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
08.05.2024 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
08.05.2024 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
14.02.2024 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.02.2024 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.02.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.02.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.02.2024 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
07.02.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.02.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.02.2024 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.01.2024 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 15
18.01.2024 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 15
18.09.2023 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
18.09.2023 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
13.09.2023 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
13.09.2023 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
21.07.2023 F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal Appeal 1
21.07.2023 F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal Appeal 1
18.07.2023 F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal Appeal 1
21.09.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 19
16.09.2022 Consolidated list of documents cited in appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.09.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.09.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
15.09.2022 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.09.2022 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.09.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 3
15.09.2022 Citation in appeal procedure - 009 Appeal 24
15.09.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.09.2022 Reply to appeal Appeal 16
02.08.2022 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
02.08.2022 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
01.08.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.07.2022 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
27.07.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.07.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.07.2022 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
22.04.2022 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 15
19.04.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.04.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.04.2022 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
23.02.2022 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
23.02.2022 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 7
18.02.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.02.2022 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Appeal 1
18.02.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
18.02.2022 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
23.12.2021 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.12.2021 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.12.2021 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
21.12.2021 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
21.12.2021 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.12.2021 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 35
21.12.2021 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.12.2021 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.12.2021 Means of redress Opposition 2
21.12.2021 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2021 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
21.12.2021 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
21.12.2021 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.12.2021 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.12.2021 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
21.12.2021 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
21.12.2021 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
21.12.2021 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
21.12.2021 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 70
22.11.2021 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 5
28.09.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 12
27.09.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 43
22.09.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.09.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
22.09.2021 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 11
20.09.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.09.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.09.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.09.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.09.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.09.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 Opposition 3
20.09.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 Opposition 3
20.09.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 Opposition 3
20.09.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 Opposition 3
20.09.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 007 Opposition 10
20.09.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 008 Opposition 11
20.09.2021 Consolidated list of cited opposition documents Opposition 1
20.09.2021 Description Opposition 4
20.09.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
20.09.2021 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.09.2021 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.09.2021 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
06.08.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
03.08.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.08.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.08.2021 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.06.2021 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 4
21.06.2021 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 4
23.12.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.12.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.12.2020 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
22.12.2020 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.12.2020 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
21.12.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.12.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.12.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
16.12.2020 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.12.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.12.2020 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
02.12.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
02.12.2020 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
30.11.2020 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
10.11.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
04.11.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.11.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
04.11.2020 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
29.10.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.10.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.10.2020 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 24
23.10.2020 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2020 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.10.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
28.09.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.09.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
28.09.2020 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
14.05.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 11
08.05.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
08.05.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
08.05.2020 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
30.01.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 18
27.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.01.2020 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
27.01.2020 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
27.01.2020 Claims Opposition 3
27.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
27.01.2020 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
24.09.2019 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
24.09.2019 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
06.09.2019 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 24
03.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.09.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
03.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 001 Opposition 24
03.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 002 Opposition 1
03.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 003 Opposition 49
03.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 004 Opposition 10
03.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 005 Opposition 15
03.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 006 Opposition 32
03.09.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
03.09.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 16
03.09.2019 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 1
02.01.2019 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Opposition 1
15.11.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.06.2018 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
25.06.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
25.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.04.2018 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
18.04.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
18.04.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
18.04.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
18.04.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 15
18.04.2018 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 15
26.03.2018 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
21.02.2018 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
14.02.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
08.02.2018 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 11
24.01.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.01.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
17.01.2018 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 14
15.01.2018 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Search / examination 1
20.09.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.08.2017 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
23.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
23.06.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
23.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
23.06.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
23.06.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
23.06.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
23.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.01.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.01.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 3
24.01.2017 European search report Search / examination 2
24.01.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
18.01.2017 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
09.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.09.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.09.2016 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
20.09.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
20.09.2016 Description Search / examination 10
20.09.2016 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.09.2016 Drawings Search / examination 1
20.09.2016 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5