Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3144255

EP3144255 - DEVICE FOR PACKAGING PIECE GOODS COMBINED IN PACKAGING UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schier, Alexander
Im Jeuch 6
77770 Durbach / DE
[2017/12]
Inventor(s)01 / * * *
 [2017/12]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/12]
Application number, filing date16189817.621.09.2016
[2017/12]
Priority number, dateDE20151011586621.09.2015         Original published format: DE102015115866
[2017/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3144255
Date:22.03.2017
Language:DE
[2017/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2017
ClassificationInternational:B65G47/90, B65G59/02, B65G61/00, // B25J15/00
[2017/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
Former [2017/12]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINRICHTUNG ZUM UMPACKEN VON ZU PACKUNGSEINHEITEN ZUSAMMENGEFASSTEN STÜCKGÜTERN[2017/12]
English:DEVICE FOR PACKAGING PIECE GOODS COMBINED IN PACKAGING UNITS[2017/12]
French:DISPOSITIF DESTINE A RECONDITIONNER DES MARCHANDISES AU DETAIL REGROUPEES EN EMBALLAGES UNITAIRES[2017/12]
Examination procedure21.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.09.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
07.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US9089969  (THEOBALD DANIEL [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7,10-12,14,15 * claim 1 * * figures 1-11 * * column 1, line 15 - line 20 * * column 2, line 31 - line 40 * * column 3, line 17 - column 10, line 39 * [Y] 6,9,13 [I] 2,6;
 [X]WO2012069056  (IND ROBOT AUTOMATION [DK], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,10-12 * claim 1 * * figures 9-10 * * page 1, line 3 - line 5 * * page 1, line 30 - page 4, line 33 * * page 6, line 3 - page 11, line 16 *;
 [X]US2013341945  (SAKA YOSHIHISA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,11 * claim 1 * * figures 1, 15 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0124] *;
 [X]JP3124464B  (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1,4,5,10-12 * claim 1 * * figures 1-12 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0016] *;
 [X]US2619241  (PREBEN JESSEN) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,10,12,14 * claim 1 * * figures 1-11 * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 21 * * column 2, line 52 - column 6, line 11 *;
 [Y]GB2205300  (BAT CIGARETTENFAB GMBH) [Y] 6,9,13 * claim 1 * * figures 1-9 * * page 1, line 1 - line 3 * * page 2, line 1 - page 6, line 10 * * page 7, line 11 - page 14, line 5 *;
 [Y]JP2011251399  (TOYOTA IND CORP) [Y] 6,9 * abstract * * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]WO2014181285  (SIR SOC ITALIANA RESINE SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 * * figures 1-15 * * page 1, line 4 - line 5 * * page 2, line 4 - line 17 * * page 3, line 14 - page 17, line 6 *