Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3147394

EP3147394 - SHAWL TEXTILE ARTICLE AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.10.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Welspun India Limited
Welspun House
6th Floor
Kamala City
Senapati Bapat Marg, Lower Parel
Mumbai 400013 / IN
[2017/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Goenka, Dipali
Welspun House, 6th Floor, Kamala City, Senapati
Bapat Marg, Lower Parel (West)
400013 Mumbai / IN
02 / Goenka, Radhika
Welspun House, 6th Floor, Kamala City, Senapati
Bapat Marg, Lower Parel (West)
400013 Mumbai / IN
03 / Palit, Subrata
Welspun House, 6th Floor, Kamala City, Senapati
Bapat Marg, Lower Parel (West)
400013 Mumbai / IN
 [2017/13]
Representative(s)Avidity IP
Broers Building
Hauser Forum
21 JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/13]Chapman, Alan Gareth
Avidity IP
Broers Building
Hauser Forum
21 JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB
Application number, filing date16190566.626.09.2016
[2017/13]
Priority number, dateUS201562232441P25.09.2015         Original published format: US 201562232441 P
US20161527472623.09.2016         Original published format: US201615274726
[2017/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3147394
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2017
ClassificationInternational:D03D1/00, D03D15/00, A41D23/00
[2017/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/45]
Former [2017/13]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TEXTILER SCHAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2017/13]
English:SHAWL TEXTILE ARTICLE AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME[2017/13]
French:ÉCHARPE TEXTILE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2017/13]
Examination procedure26.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.09.2017Examination requested  [2017/45]
02.04.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/37]
02.05.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/37]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201803   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]JP2013147762  (NISSHINBO TEXTILE INC) [Y] 1-12,18,19 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0024] * * figures 1-6 *
 [Y]JP2003246931  (TOYO BOSEKI; KANKYO KAGAKU KAIHATSU KK) [Y] 1-19 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0054] *
 [Y]JP3296859B  (KURARAY CO) [Y] 1-6,18,19 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] *
 [Y]JP2003268679  (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [Y] 1-6,18,19 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0018] *
 [Y]CN101285238  (RUGAO DINGYAN TEXTILE CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document *
 [Y]WO2009031946  (SCA HYGIENE PROD AB [SE]; NIHLSTRAND ANNA [SE]; GABRIELII INGE [SE]; H) [Y] 1-19 * page 17, line 13 - line 20 *
 [Y]DE202005018048U  (GOEZZE WOLFGANG [DE]) [Y] 13-17 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] *
 [Y]CN103014992B  (JIANGSU SUNSHINE CO LTD) [Y] 13-17 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - Anonymous, "Celliant Fibers, Yarns and Fabrics", (20150905), URL: www.celliant.com, (20170202), XP055341666 [Y] 1-6,18,19 * the whole document *