Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3311780

EP3311780 - SPRING BASE GLENOSPHERE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.07.2019
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.11.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, IN 46582 / US
[2018/17]
Inventor(s)01 / WINSLOW, Nathan A.
2677 Lake Tahoe Trail
Warsaw, IN 46582 / US
02 / McDANIEL, John M.
35 Ems B72
Warsaw, IN 46580 / US
 [2018/17]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2018/17]
Application number, filing date16192293.509.05.2012
[2018/17]
Priority number, dateUS20111311554825.05.2011         Original published format: US201113115548
[2018/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3311780
Date:25.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/40
[2018/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/49]
Former [2018/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:GEFEDERTE GLENOSPHÄRE[2018/17]
English:SPRING BASE GLENOSPHERE[2018/17]
French:GLÉNOSPHÈRE À BASE DE RESSORT[2018/17]
Examination procedure28.02.2017Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
11.04.2017Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
19.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.10.2018Examination requested  [2018/49]
19.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12723008.4  / EP2713957
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
04.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
04.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
13.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]US2004220673  (PRIA PAOLO DALLA [IT]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0025] - [0053] *;
 [A]WO2004024037  (FERREE BRET A [US]) [A] 1-12 * pages 7-10 *;
 [A]WO2005079407  (SPINECORE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * pages 13-14; figure 4 *;
 [A]WO2009094477  (SPINALMOTION INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0030] - [0038] *;
 [AP]WO2011150180  (ORBIS MEDICAL GROUP LLC [US], et al) [AP] 1-12 * pages 26,27 * * pages 38,39 *