Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3306336

EP3306336 - HADRON THERAPY DEVICE AND MRI DEVICE HAVING MAGNETIC FIELD CORRECTING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.10.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ION BEAM APPLICATIONS S.A.
Chemin du Cyclotron, 3
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[2018/15]
Inventor(s)01 / FORTON, Eric
c/o Ion Beam Applications S.A.
Chemin du Cyclotron 3
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
02 / HENROTIN, Sébastien
c/o Ion Beam Applications S.A.
Chemin du Cyclotron 3
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
 [2018/15]
Representative(s)Pecher, Nicolas , et al
Pecher & Partners
Rue Louis de Geer, 6
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[2018/15]
Application number, filing date16192761.107.10.2016
[2018/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3306336
Date:11.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01R33/48, G01R33/3875, // G01R33/3873, A61N5/10
[2018/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/47]
Former [2018/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HADRON-THERAPIEVORRICHTUNG UND MRT-VORRICHTUNG MIT MAGNETFELDKORREKTUREINRICHTUNG[2018/15]
English:HADRON THERAPY DEVICE AND MRI DEVICE HAVING MAGNETIC FIELD CORRECTING MEANS[2018/15]
French:DISPOSITIF D'HADRONTHÉRAPIE ET DISPOSITIF IRM COMPRENANT DES MOYENS DE CORRECTION DE CHAMP MAGNÉTIQUE[2018/15]
Examination procedure11.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.10.2018Examination requested  [2018/47]
11.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2016011288  (OVERWEG JOHANNES ADRIANUS [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] , [0052] , [0054] , [0075] - [0090]; claim 1 *;
 [Y]US6545476  (HEID OLIVER [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, line 27 - column 2, line 22 * * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 9 * * column 4, line 39 - line 67 * * column 5, line 49 - line 61; claim 1 *;
 [YD]WO2015197475  (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [YD] 5,6 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2013147476  (SHVARTSMAN SHMARYU [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0082] *
 [A]  - WACHOWICZ K ET AL, "Geometric distortion and shimming considerations in a rotating MR-linac design due to the influence of low-level external magnetic fields", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, vol. 39, no. 5, doi:10.1118/1.3702591, ISSN 0094-2405, (20120419), pages 2659 - 2668, (20120419), XP012161022 [A] 1-7 * section III.D. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.3702591
by applicantWO2015197475
 US8410730
 EP0186238