Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3165418

EP3165418 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A SYSTEM FOR WIPING AND WASHING A WINDOW OF A VEHICLE AND SYSTEM USING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.04.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valeo Systèmes d'Essuyage
Service Propriété Industrielle
8 Rue Louis Lormand
CS 90581 La Verrière
78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR
[2017/19]
Inventor(s)01 / THEBAULT, Denis
4 Rue du Fort
63370 LEMPDES / FR
 [2017/19]
Representative(s)Vincent, Catherine Marie Marguerite
Valeo Systèmes d'Essuyage
Service Propriété Industrielle
ZA L'Agiot
8 Rue Louis Lormand, CS 90581 La Verrière
78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR
[2017/19]
Application number, filing date16192883.307.10.2016
[2017/19]
Priority number, dateFR2015006052603.11.2015         Original published format: FR 1560526
[2017/19]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3165418
Date:10.05.2017
Language:FR
[2017/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3165418
Date:05.09.2018
Language:FR
[2018/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60S1/48
[2017/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/19]
TitleGerman:STEUERVERFAHREN EINES WISCH-/WASCHSYSTEMS FÜR DIE SCHEIBE EINES FAHRZEUGS, UND SYSTEM ZUR VERWENDUNG DESSELBEN[2017/19]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A SYSTEM FOR WIPING AND WASHING A WINDOW OF A VEHICLE AND SYSTEM USING IT[2017/19]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN SYSTÈME D'ESSUYAGE ET DE LAVAGE D'UNE VITRE D'UN VÉHICULE ET SYSTÈME LE METTANT EN OEUVRE[2017/19]
Examination procedure07.10.2016Examination requested  [2017/19]
07.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2018Fee for grant paid
20.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
[2019/20]
Former [2019/12]AL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
NO05.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT05.09.2018