blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3153839

EP3153839 - TEMPERATURE CHAMBER OF A LOAD DEVICE AS A PILLAR MATERIAL TESTING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A TEMPERATURE CHAMBER WITH AN ELEMENT FOR A BACKLIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.04.2023
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.05.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.02.2022
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.01.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.09.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.10.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZwickRoell GmbH & Co. KG
August-Nagel-Straße 11
89079 Ulm / DE
[2019/17]
Former [2017/15]For all designated states
Zwick GmbH & Co. Kg
August-Nagel-Strasse 11
89079 Ulm / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dieker, Thomas
Wagnerstr. 119
89077 Ulm / DE
 [2017/15]
Representative(s)Cremer, Christian
Cremer & Cremer Patentanwälte St.-Barbara-Straße 16
89077 Ulm / DE
[2017/15]
Application number, filing date16192902.107.10.2016
[2017/15]
Priority number, dateDE20151011713407.10.2015         Original published format: DE102015117134
DE201520105319U07.10.2015         Original published format: DE 202015105319 U
[2017/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3153839
Date:12.04.2017
Language:DE
[2017/15]
Type: A9 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP3153839
Date:22.11.2017
[2017/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3153839
Date:15.06.2022
Language:DE
[2022/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2017
ClassificationIPC:G01N3/06, G01N3/18
[2017/15]
CPC:
G01N3/18 (EP); G01N3/068 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/09]
Former [2017/47]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Former [2017/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:TEMPERIERKAMMER EINER BELASTUNGSEINRICHTUNG WIE EINER SÄULENMATERIALPRÜFMASCHINE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER SOLCHEN TEMPERIERKAMMER MIT EINEM ELEMENT FÜR EINE HINTERGRUNDBELEUCHTUNG[2017/15]
English:TEMPERATURE CHAMBER OF A LOAD DEVICE AS A PILLAR MATERIAL TESTING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A TEMPERATURE CHAMBER WITH AN ELEMENT FOR A BACKLIGHT[2017/15]
French:ENCEINTE THERMIQUE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE CHARGEMENT ET MACHINE DE VÉRIFICATION DE MATÉRIAU DE COLONNE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE TELLE ENCEINTE THERMIQUE COMPRENANT UN ÉLÉMENT POUR UN RÉTRO-ÉCLAIRAGE[2017/15]
Examination procedure07.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.10.2017Examination requested  [2017/47]
21.02.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.08.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.08.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.01.2022Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
11.02.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.05.2022Fee for grant paid
03.05.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.05.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)16.03.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2023/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.10.2016
AL15.06.2022
CY15.06.2022
CZ15.06.2022
DK15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
MC15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SI15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
IE07.10.2022
LU07.10.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
BE31.10.2022
CH31.10.2022
LI31.10.2022
[2024/21]
Former [2024/18]HU07.10.2016
AL15.06.2022
CZ15.06.2022
DK15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
MC15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SI15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
IE07.10.2022
LU07.10.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
BE31.10.2022
CH31.10.2022
LI31.10.2022
Former [2023/48]AL15.06.2022
CZ15.06.2022
DK15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
MC15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SI15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
IE07.10.2022
LU07.10.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
BE31.10.2022
CH31.10.2022
LI31.10.2022
Former [2023/42]AL15.06.2022
CZ15.06.2022
DK15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
MC15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SI15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
LU07.10.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
BE31.10.2022
CH31.10.2022
LI31.10.2022
Former [2023/35]AL15.06.2022
CZ15.06.2022
DK15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
MC15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SI15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
LU07.10.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
CH31.10.2022
LI31.10.2022
Former [2023/30]AL15.06.2022
CZ15.06.2022
DK15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
MC15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SI15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
LU07.10.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
Former [2023/25]AL15.06.2022
CZ15.06.2022
DK15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
MC15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SI15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
Former [2023/21]AL15.06.2022
CZ15.06.2022
DK15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
Former [2023/17]AL15.06.2022
CZ15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
Former [2023/12]CZ15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
Former [2023/11]CZ15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
PT17.10.2022
Former [2023/09]CZ15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
PT17.10.2022
Former [2023/02]FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
Former [2022/50]FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
Former [2022/49]FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
Former [2022/47]FI15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
NO15.09.2022
Documents cited:Search[YD]DE19754129  (KARLSRUHE FORSCHZENT [DE]) [YD] 1-15 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 56 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]JP2008039359  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-15* PAJ abstract *;
 [XI]  - Boris Plach, "Die neuen Temperierkammern Made by Zwick", (20150814), URL: https://www.testxpo.com/, (20170217), XP055347260 [X] 1,14 * the whole document * [I] 2-13,15
by applicantDE1465606U
 DE1906764U
 DE2239554
 DE3422988
 DE3741429
 DE4021837
 JPH05302880
 DE19754129
 DE10112200
 WO2010040326
 DE202013001062U
 DE112009005323
 DE102011055953
 DE102012221581
 DE202012012503U
 DE102013211099
 DE102013220392
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.