Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3156291

EP3156291 - CONVENIENCE APPARATUS FOR VEHICLE AND VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.08.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2017/16]
Inventor(s)01 / YOO, Wonseok
128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu
07336 Seoul / KR
 [2017/16]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2017/16]
Application number, filing date16193004.510.10.2016
[2017/16]
Priority number, dateKR2015014171908.10.2015         Original published format: KR 20150141719
[2017/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3156291
Date:19.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3156291
Date:07.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60R25/24, B62D15/02, B60W50/08, B60W10/18, B60W10/20
[2017/38]
Former International [2017/16]B60R25/24, B62D15/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/36]
Former [2017/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:KOMFORTVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRZEUG SOWIE FAHRZEUG[2017/16]
English:CONVENIENCE APPARATUS FOR VEHICLE AND VEHICLE[2017/16]
French:APPAREIL D'APPOINT POUR VÉHICULE ET VÉHICULE[2017/16]
Examination procedure10.10.2016Examination requested  [2017/16]
10.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2017Fee for grant paid
22.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)08.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/03]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL07.02.2018
AT07.02.2018
CY07.02.2018
CZ07.02.2018
DK07.02.2018
EE07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
LV07.02.2018
MC07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
RO07.02.2018
RS07.02.2018
SE07.02.2018
SK07.02.2018
SM07.02.2018
BG07.05.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
IS07.06.2018
IE10.10.2018
LU10.10.2018
MT10.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/48]AL07.02.2018
AT07.02.2018
CY07.02.2018
CZ07.02.2018
DK07.02.2018
EE07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
LV07.02.2018
MC07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
RO07.02.2018
RS07.02.2018
SE07.02.2018
SK07.02.2018
SM07.02.2018
BG07.05.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
IS07.06.2018
IE10.10.2018
LU10.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
Former [2019/38]AL07.02.2018
AT07.02.2018
CY07.02.2018
CZ07.02.2018
DK07.02.2018
EE07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
LV07.02.2018
MC07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
RO07.02.2018
RS07.02.2018
SE07.02.2018
SK07.02.2018
SM07.02.2018
BG07.05.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
IS07.06.2018
LU10.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
Former [2019/30]AL07.02.2018
AT07.02.2018
CY07.02.2018
CZ07.02.2018
DK07.02.2018
EE07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
LV07.02.2018
MC07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
RO07.02.2018
RS07.02.2018
SE07.02.2018
SK07.02.2018
SM07.02.2018
BG07.05.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
IS07.06.2018
LU10.10.2018
Former [2019/28]AL07.02.2018
AT07.02.2018
CY07.02.2018
CZ07.02.2018
DK07.02.2018
EE07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
LV07.02.2018
MC07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
RO07.02.2018
RS07.02.2018
SE07.02.2018
SK07.02.2018
SM07.02.2018
BG07.05.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
IS07.06.2018
Former [2018/52]AL07.02.2018
AT07.02.2018
CY07.02.2018
CZ07.02.2018
DK07.02.2018
EE07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
LV07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
RO07.02.2018
RS07.02.2018
SE07.02.2018
SK07.02.2018
SM07.02.2018
BG07.05.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
IS07.06.2018
Former [2018/51]AL07.02.2018
AT07.02.2018
CY07.02.2018
CZ07.02.2018
DK07.02.2018
EE07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
LV07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
RO07.02.2018
RS07.02.2018
SE07.02.2018
SK07.02.2018
BG07.05.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
IS07.06.2018
Former [2018/50]AL07.02.2018
AT07.02.2018
CY07.02.2018
CZ07.02.2018
EE07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
LV07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
RO07.02.2018
RS07.02.2018
SE07.02.2018
SK07.02.2018
BG07.05.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
IS07.06.2018
Former [2018/46]AL07.02.2018
AT07.02.2018
CY07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
LV07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
RS07.02.2018
SE07.02.2018
BG07.05.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
IS07.06.2018
Former [2018/40]AT07.02.2018
CY07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
LV07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
RS07.02.2018
SE07.02.2018
BG07.05.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
IS07.06.2018
Former [2018/39]AT07.02.2018
CY07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
LV07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
RS07.02.2018
SE07.02.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
IS07.06.2018
Former [2018/37]CY07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
NO07.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
NO07.05.2018
Documents cited:Search[XAI]JP2005315024  (FUJITSU TEN LTD, et al) [X] 1,10-15 * paragraphs [0073] - [0077] - [0082] , [0083]; figures 1-9 * * abstract * [A] 3-7 [I] 2,8,9;
 [XA]DE102011111600  (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1,10-15 * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] - [0022] - [0027]; figures 1,2 * * abstract * [A] 2-9;
 [XA]US2012056734  (IKEDA KEIGO [JP], et al) [X] 1,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0037] - [0062]; figures 1-8 * * abstract * [A] 2-14;
 [A]WO2015002090  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]EP2560150  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2522554  (LEAR CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *