Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3165992

EP3165992 - VEHICLE REMOTE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20 Wernerstrasse 1
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2017/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Fremiot, Guillaume
32, Chemin du Combard
69530 Orliénas / FR
02 / Dollhofer, Benjamin
Gartenstraße 1
77833 Ottersweier / DE
 [2017/19]
Representative(s)Maiß, Harald
Bosch Rexroth AG
Patentabteilung
Postfach 11 64
97419 Schweinfurt / DE
[2017/19]
Application number, filing date16193641.413.10.2016
[2017/19]
Priority number, dateFR2015006064706.11.2015         Original published format: FR 1560647
[2017/19]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3165992
Date:10.05.2017
Language:FR
[2017/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:G05G9/047
[2017/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/51]
Former [2017/19]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FERNBEDIENUNG FÜR MOTOR[2017/19]
English:VEHICLE REMOTE CONTROL[2017/19]
French:TÉLÈCOMMANDE D'ENGIN[2017/19]
Examination procedure13.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.11.2017Examination requested  [2017/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2008115611  (LARSON KEITH D [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9 * paragraphs [0026] , [0031]; figures 3,7 * [I] 4,5;
 [A]DE1238547  (STARKSTROM APPBAU G M B H) [A] 1 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US4422345  (GREEN MERLIN G [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2929258  (MACKWAY HAROLD J) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US6400352  (BRUNEAU RYAN D [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 3 *
by applicantUS6512509
 WO0165328