Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3196919

EP3196919 - CRYOGENIC SPECIMEN PROCESSING IN A CHARGED PARTICLE MICROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT, SM
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FEI Company
5350 NE Dawson Creek Drive
Hillsboro, OR 97124-5793 / US
[2017/30]
Inventor(s)01 / MITCHELS, John
Sokolsa 720, Modrice
664 42 Brno / CZ
02 / VYSTAVEL, Tomás
K Babe 7
62100 Brno / CZ
03 / CAFOUREK, Martin
Výcapy 171
67401 Trebic / CZ
 [2017/30]
Representative(s)Janssen, Francis-Paul
FEI Company
Patent Department
P.O.Box 1745
5602 BS Eindhoven / NL
[2018/38]
Former [2017/30]Bakker, Hendrik
FEI Company Patent Department P.O. Box 1745
5602 BS Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date16194724.720.10.2016
[2017/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3196919
Date:26.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3196919
Date:19.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01J37/18
[2017/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/30]
TitleGerman:KRYOGENE VERARBEITUNG VON PROBEN IN EINEM LADUNGSTRÄGERTEILCHENMIKROSKOP[2017/30]
English:CRYOGENIC SPECIMEN PROCESSING IN A CHARGED PARTICLE MICROSCOPE[2017/30]
French:TRAITEMENT DE SPÉCIMEN CRYOGÉNIQUE DANS UN MICROSCOPE À PARTICULES CHARGÉES[2017/30]
Examination procedure20.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/30]
25.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2018Fee for grant paid
06.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
[2019/26]
Former [2019/23]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
NO19.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT19.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US2007262050  (GOLOVCHENKO JENE A [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * paragraphs [0026] - [0028] - [0041] , [0085] - [0088] *;
 [A]US2007187601  (MITO HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,10 * paragraphs [0057] - [0064] *;
 [A]US5093577  (DE POORTER JOHANNES A [NL], et al) [A] 1,10 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 28 * * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 24; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]JP2011034741  (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP) [A] 1,10 * abstract *
by applicantUS9116091
 EP2853847
    - W.H. ESCOVITZ; T.R. FOX; R. LEVI-SETTI, "Scanning Transmission Ion Microscope with a Field Ion Source", PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 72, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.72.5.1826, (1975), pages 1826 - 1828, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/22472444, XP002402529

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.72.5.1826
    - U. MUEHLE ET AL., MICROSCOPY: SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, APPLICATIONS AND EDUCATION, (2010), pages 1704 - 1716