Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3181911

EP3181911 - KANTENBERANDUNG EINES ROTATIONSELEMENTS UND GEBLÄSERAD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip31.10.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ebm-papst Mulfingen GmbH & Co. KG
Bachmühle 2
74673 Mulfingen / DE
[2017/25]
Inventor(s)01 / KRANER, Denis
Eisenbergweg 69
97980 Bad Mergentheim / DE
02 / HELI, Thomas
Michelbacher Str. 46
74595 Langenburg / DE
 [2017/25]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/25]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date16195358.324.10.2016
[2017/25]
Priority number, dateDE20151012213217.12.2015         Original published format: DE102015122132
[2017/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3181911
Date:21.06.2017
Language:DE
[2017/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:F04D29/28, F04D29/30
[2017/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/03]
Former [2017/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KANTENBERANDUNG EINES ROTATIONSELEMENTS UND GEBLÄSERAD[2017/25]
English:KANTENBERANDUNG EINES ROTATIONSELEMENTS UND GEBLÄSERAD[2017/25]
French:KANTENBERANDUNG EINES ROTATIONSELEMENTS UND GEBLÄSERAD[2017/25]
Examination procedure24.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[IA]GB517293  (VICTOR VLADIMIROVITCH DIBOVSKY) [I] 1-3 * page 3, line 70 - line 83; figure 3 * * page 2, line 112 - line 118; figure 2 * [A] 5-15;
 [A]FR1295593  (SNECMA) [A] 1-4,15 * page 1, column l, line 1 - column r, line 8; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]CN203230624U  (HEFEI KINGHOME ELECTRICAL APPLIANCES CO LTD) [A] 1-3,5-7,9,12-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0 34]; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]GB710391  (HOWDEN JAMES & CO LTD) [A] 1-3,5-7,9,12-15 * page 2, line 25 - line 43; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]CN201513380U  (ZHEJIANG SHUANGYANG FAN CO LTD) [A] 1-3,5-7,9-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0009]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE9303711U  (BABCOCK-BSH AG) [A] 1-3,15 * page 1, line 18 - line 24 *
by applicantEP2366907