Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3207988

EP3207988 - METHOD OF PREPARING A MODIFIED ZEOLITE CATALYST AND PREPARING ETHYLBENZENE USING ONE CYCLE PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.02.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
King Abdulaziz City for Science and Technology
The National Center for
Technology Development
P.O.Box 6086
11442 Riyadh / SA
For all designated states
Inorganic Chemistry Laboratory Oxford University
University Oxford South Parks Rd.
Oxford, Oxfordshire OX1 3QR / GB
[2017/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Al-Kinany, Mohammad
KING ABDULAZIZ CITY FOR SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY
P.O. Box 6086
11442 Riyadh / SA
02 / Almegren, Hamid
KING ABDULAZIZ CITY FOR SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY
P.O. Box 6086
11442 Riyadh / SA
03 / Aldrees, Saud
KING ABDULAZIZ CITY FOR SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY
P.O. Box 6086
11442 Riyadh / SA
04 / Al-Ghilan, Eyad
KING ABDULAZIZ CITY FOR SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY
P.O. Box 6086
11442 Riyadh / SA
05 / Al-Dress, Sami
KING ABDULAZIZ CITY FOR SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY
P.O. Box 6086
11442 Riyadh / SA
06 / Al-Ghamdi, Abdullah
KING ABDULAZIZ CITY FOR SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY
P.O. Box 6086
11442 Riyadh / SA
07 / Edwards, Peter
INORGANIC CHEMISTRY LABORATORY OXFORD UNIVERSITY
University Oxford
South Parks Rd
Oxford, Oxfordshire OX1 3QR / GB
08 / Xiao, Tiancun
INORGANIC CHEMISTRY LABORATORY OXFORD UNIVERSITY
University Oxford
South Parks Rd
Oxford, OXfordshire OX1 3QR / GB
 [2017/34]
Representative(s)Peguet, Wilfried , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63 avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/34]Peguet, Wilfried , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
Application number, filing date16195781.626.10.2016
[2017/34]
Priority number, dateUS20161504629617.02.2016         Original published format: US201615046296
[2017/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3207988
Date:23.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:B01J29/40, B01J37/34, B01J37/08, B01J37/14
[2017/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/12]
Former [2017/34]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MODIFIZIERTEN ZEOLITHKATALYSATORS UND ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ETHYLBENZEN MITHILFE EINES KREISVERFAHRENS[2017/34]
English:METHOD OF PREPARING A MODIFIED ZEOLITE CATALYST AND PREPARING ETHYLBENZENE USING ONE CYCLE PROCESS[2017/34]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN CATALYSEUR DE ZÉOLITHE MODIFIÉ ET PRÉPARATION D'ÉTHYLBENZÈNE AU MOYEN D'UN PROCESSUS CYCLIQUE[2017/34]
Examination procedure26.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/12]
01.05.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/41]
27.05.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/41]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201803   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US6995111  (LEVIN DORON [US] ET AL) [X] 1-24 * column 12, line 12 - column 15, line 10; examples 19, 20 *
 [X]  - BEJOY THOMAS AND SANKARAN SUGUNAN, "Effect of rare earth metal ions on the structural and textural properties of NaFAU-Y zeolite and vapour phase alkylation of benzene with 1-octene", INDIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL TECHNO, SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS, JODHPUR, INDIA, IN, (20051101), vol. 12, ISSN 0971-457X, pages 676 - 688, XP008140751 [X] 1-32 * experimental procedure; catalytic activity, conclusions;; tables 1,2 *
 [X]  - SUGI Y ET AL, "Shape-selective alkylation and related reactions of mononuclear aromatic hydrocarbons over H-ZSM-5 zeolites modified with lanthanum and cerium oxides", APPLIED CATALYSIS A: GENERAL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 299, doi:10.1016/J.APCATA.2005.10.024, ISSN 0926-860X, (20060117), pages 157 - 166, (20060117), XP028001439 [X] 1-32 * experimental ; conclusion *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apcata.2005.10.024