Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3153135

EP3153135 - A GASTROINTESTINAL IMPLANT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.10.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
19.04.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Coloplast A/S
Holtedam 1
3050 Humlebaek / DK
[2017/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BEHAN, Niall
Cois Locha, Carraghadoo
Kilcolgan, County Galway / IE
 [2017/15]
Application number, filing date16196693.217.12.2010
[2017/15]
Priority number, dateUS20090287946P18.12.2009         Original published format: US 287946 P
[2017/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3153135
Date:12.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61F5/00
[2017/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/47]
Former [2017/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:GASTROINTESTINALE IMPLANTATVORRICHTUNG[2017/15]
English:A GASTROINTESTINAL IMPLANT DEVICE[2017/15]
French:DISPOSITIF D'IMPLANT GASTRO-INTESTINAL[2017/15]
Examination procedure01.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.10.2017Examination requested  [2017/47]
25.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10801705.4  / EP2512386
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
01.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
01.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
01.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
01.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2001020190  (TAYLOR THOMAS V [US]) [X] 1,4-14 * paragraphs [0042] - [0043] - [0054]; figure 11 * [Y] 11-14 [I] 2,3;
 [XDYI]US2007198048  (BEHAN NIALL [IE], et al) [XD] 1,4-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0163] , [0199] - [0205] - [0225] , [0256] - [0300] - [0399] - [0402] * [Y] 11-14 [I] 2,3,11-14;
 [XDP]WO2009153768  (VYS RA BIOMEDICAL LTD [IE], et al) [XDP] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003069635  (CARTLEDGE RICHARD G [US], et al) [A] 11-14 * paragraphs [0080] - [0081] - [0093] - [0095]; figure 5 *
by applicantUS2005125075
 US2007198048
 US2010137998
    - Handbook of Chemistry and Physics
    - ISMAIL, J.; BANCEWICZ, J., "Yield pressure, anatomy of the cardia and gastro-oesophageal reflux", BAROW BRITISH JOURNAL OF SURGERY., (1995), vol. 82, pages 943 - 947
    - DEMEESTER TR; JOHNSON LF; JOSEPH GJ ET AL., "Patterns of Gastroesophageal Reflux in Health and Disease", ANN. SURG., (197610), pages 459 - 469
    - PANDOLFINO JE; RICHTER JE; OURS T ET AL., "Ambulatory Esophageal pH Monitoring Using a Wireless System", AM. J. GASTRO, (2003), vol. 98, page 4
    - MAHMOOD Z; MCMAHON BP; ARFIN Q ET AL., "Results of endoscopic gastroplasty for gastroesophageal reflux disease: a one year prospective follow-up", GUT, (2003), vol. 52, pages 34 - 9
    - PARK PO; KJELLIN T; APPEYARD MN ET AL., "Results of endoscopic gastroplasty suturing for treatment of GERD: a multicentre trial", GASTROINTEST ENDOSC, (2001), vol. 53, page AB115
    - FILIPI CJ; LEHMAN GA; ROTHSTEIN RI ET AL., "Transoralflexible endoscopic suturing for treatment of GERD: a multicenter trial", GASTROINTEST ENDOSC, (2001), vol. 53, pages 416 - 22
    - ARTS J; SLOOTMAEKERS S; SIFRIM D ET AL., "Endoluminal gastroplication (Endocinch) in GERD patient's refractory to PPI therapy", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2002), vol. 122, page A47
    - FILIPI CJ; LEHMAN GA; ROTHSTEIN RI ET AL., "Transoral flexible endoscopic suturing for treatment of GERD: a multicenter trial", GASTROINTEST ENDOSC, (2001), vol. 53, pages 416 - 22